Rose v. Evenflo Company Inc
Plaintiff: Najah Rose
Defendant: Evenflo Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11069
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 15 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Motion for appointment of lead counsel and/or proposed further initial case management orders as to "All Actions" shall be filed by July 9, 2020.Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02938-DJC et al.(Hourihan, Lisa)
June 9, 2020 Filing 14 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 1 Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02938-DJC et al.(Hourihan, Lisa)
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO, MDL No. 2938 has been transferred from Eastern District of Wisconsin and assigned civil action number: 20-11069. Eastern District of Wisconsin case number: 20-00287. (Jones, Sherry)
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. (Jones, Sherry)
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00287.
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts signed on 06/02/2020. (cc: all counsel)(jcl)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory F Coleman on behalf of Najah Rose. Attorney(s) appearing: Gregory F. Coleman (Coleman, Gregory)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Cohen on behalf of Najah Rose. Attorney(s) appearing: Jonathan B. Cohen (Cohen, Jonathan)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/18/20 granting #6 Motion to Stay. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Evenflo Company Inc. (Valdetero, Jena)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer and Consolidation by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Evenflo Company Inc. (Valdetero, Jena)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jena M Valdetero on behalf of Evenflo Company Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Jena M. Valdetero (Valdetero, Jena)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Motion for Transfer filed with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (jcl)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Najah Rose. Evenflo Company Inc served on 2/25/2020. (Crueger, Charles)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Najah Rose. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Crueger, Charles)
February 21, 2020 Summons Issued as to Evenflo Company Inc. (jcl)
February 21, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Najah Rose. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3370376) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Crueger, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Evenflo Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Najah Rose
Represented By: Charles J Crueger
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Jonathan Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evenflo Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jena M Valdetero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?