Alston v. Evenflo Company Inc
Plaintiff: Tarnisha Alston
Defendant: Evenflo Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11072
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 22 Remark: Orders on Motions for Pro hac vice, the judge in South Carolina ruled on these and didn't make it to the docket before it was transferred here. (Attachments: #1 order, #2 order) (Jones, Sherry)
June 9, 2020 Filing 21 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Motion for appointment of lead counsel and/or proposed further initial case management orders as to "All Actions" shall be filed by July 9, 2020.Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02938-DJC et al.(Hourihan, Lisa)
June 9, 2020 Filing 20 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 1 Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02938-DJC et al.(Hourihan, Lisa)
June 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO, MDL No. 2938 has been transferred from South Carolina and assigned civil action number: 20-11072. South Carolina case number: 20-00287. (Jones, Sherry)
June 5, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. (Jones, Sherry)
June 5, 2020 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 9:20-cv-00801.
June 4, 2020 Filing 16 Case transferred to Massachusetts per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order: Transferred to Judge Denise J. Casper pursuant to MDL transfer order (MDL 2938). The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (sshe, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan B. Cohen ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-9117276) by Tarnisha Alston. Response to Motion due by 6/9/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for PHV Admission, #2 Supporting Documents Attachment "A" to Application for PHV Adimssion, #3 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Segui, Harper)
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory F. Coleman ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-9117215) by Tarnisha Alston. Response to Motion due by 6/9/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for PHV Admission, #2 Supporting Documents Attachment "A" to Application for PHV Adimssion, #3 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Segui, Harper)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Martha A. Geer ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-9116962) by Tarnisha Alston. Response to Motion due by 6/9/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for PHV Admission, #2 Supporting Documents Attachment "A" to Application for PHV Adimssion, #3 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Segui, Harper)
May 25, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Defendant has moved, with the consent of plaintiff, to continue the stay of the proceedings in this court until a decision by the Panel on Multi-District Litigation is made. (Dkt. No. 11). The Court grants a stay for an additional sixty (60) days or five days after the MDL Panel has ruled, whichever is earlier. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/25/20.(ltap, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 Amended MOTION to Stay by Evenflo Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 6/4/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Rogers, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Defendant has moved, with the consent of Plaintiff, for a stay of the proceedings in this matter while this and similar cases are being considered for transfer to a MDL. (Dkt. No. 8). The Panel on Multi-District Litigation is reportedly considering this matter on 5/28/20. For good cause shown, this motion to stay is granted until 6/1/20. Any additional request for an extension shall include an update on the status of the MDL petition. The parties shall promptly advise the Court of any decision by the MDL Panel. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 4/6/20.(ltap, )
April 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by Evenflo Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/17/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Stay All Proceedings)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Rogers, James)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Evenflo Company Inc.(Rogers, James)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of MDL Notice of Related Action In Re MDL 2938 "Notice of Appearance of counsel for other party Plaintiffs in related action Proof of Service" (sshe, )
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing of MDL Notice of Related Action "Plaintiffs' Motion for Transfer of Actions to the District of Massachusetts Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407" (sshe, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Evenflo Company Inc. (sshe, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tarnisha Alston.(sshe, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Evenflo Company Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8959117.), filed by Tarnisha Alston. Service due by 5/20/2020(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alston v. Evenflo Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarnisha Alston
Represented By: Harper T. Segui
Represented By: Jonathan Cohen
Represented By: Martha A. Geer
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evenflo Company, Inc.
Represented By: James F. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?