De Los Santos v. National Railroad Passenger Corp. (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: Jose De Los Santos
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corp. (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 1:2020cv11103
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by National Railroad Passenger Corp. (AMTRAK).(Setia, Sonali)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sonali Setia. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Currie, Haley)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sonali Setia Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8331980 by National Railroad Passenger Corp. (AMTRAK).(Belostock, Lorraine)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by National Railroad Passenger Corp. (AMTRAK). (Belostock, Lorraine) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/2/2020) (McKillop, Matthew).
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Railroad Passenger Corp. (AMTRAK) identifying Other Affiliate Canadian Pacific Railway, Other Affiliate Passenger Railroad Insurance Limited, Other Affiliate Washington Terminal Company, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Other Affiliate Burlington Northern and Santa Fe LLC, Other Affiliate American Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate American Premier Underwriters, Inc., Other Affiliate Canadian National Railway for National Railroad Passenger Corp. (AMTRAK).. (Belostock, Lorraine)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lorraine Belostock on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corp. (AMTRAK) (Belostock, Lorraine)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to National Railroad Passenger Corp. (AMTRAK). Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Railroad Passenger Corp. (AMTRAK) Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8278545 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jose De Los Santos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Naumes, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Los Santos v. National Railroad Passenger Corp. (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corp. (AMTRAK)
Represented By: Lorraine Belostock
Represented By: Sonali Setia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose De Los Santos
Represented By: Christopher C. Naumes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?