Victim Rights Law Center et al v. DeVos et al
Plaintiff: Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Equal Rights Advocates, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Lisa Doe, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Jane Doe, Susan Doe, Nancy Doe, Jill Doe and Mary Doe
Defendant: Elizabeth D. DeVos, U.S. Department of Education, Kenneth L. Marcus, US Attorney General William Barr, AUSA Andrew E Lelling and Kimberly Richey
Amicus Curiae: National LGBTQ Task Force, Vera House, Inc., California Women's Law Center, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Association of College and University Business Officers, League of United Latin American Citizens, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Japanese American Citizens League, American Men's Studies Association, Council of Independent Colleges, The Council of the Great City Schools, North American MenEngage Network, GLSEN, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Feminist Majority Foundation, Ten Men - Rhode Island Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Promundo, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Law Professors, Association of American Medical Colleges, Men's Story Project, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, University Risk Management and Insurance Association, NASP - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, WASC Senior College and University Commission, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, Clearinghouse on Womens Issues, CONNECT, Inc., American Humanist Association, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, Men and Masculinities Knowledge Community, AASA, The School Superintendents' Association, American Association of University Professors, American Association of University Women, Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges, Council for Advancement and Support of Education, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Survivors of Sexual Violence, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, American Council on Education, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, National Association of Secondary School Principals, New England Commission of Higher Education, American Association of Community Colleges, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Center for Transgender Equality, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, American Dental Education Association, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, Members of Congress, Education Law Center-PA, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of American Universities, Jana's Campaign, Inc., Men Stopping Violence, American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIO, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Families Advocating for Campus Equality, Stop Abusive and Violent Environments and State of Texas
Intervenor Defendant: Independent Women's Law Center, Speech First, Inc., Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, John Doe, Steve Doe and Zachary Doe
Case Number: 1:2020cv11104
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Referring Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 223 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Daniel Tingley (Tingley, Daniel)
November 18, 2021 Filing 222 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Coppola, Katelyn)
November 18, 2021 Filing 221 Transcript of TRO Bench Trial held on November 12, 2020, before Judge William G. Young. COA Case No. 21-1853. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. Redaction Request due 12/9/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2022. (Coppola, Katelyn)
October 20, 2021 Filing 220 USCA Case Number 21-1853 for #218 Notice of Appeal, filed by Steve Doe, John Doe, Zachary Doe, Families Advocating for Campus Equality. (Paine, Matthew)
October 19, 2021 Filing 219 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #218 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
October 18, 2021 Filing 218 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #215 Order by John Doe, Steve Doe, Zachary Doe, Families Advocating for Campus Equality Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number AMADC-9014133 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 11/8/2021. (Brooks, Douglas)
October 14, 2021 Filing 217 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #201 Notice of Appeal, #191 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, Documents included: ECF Nos. 215 and 216 (Paine, Matthew) Modified on 10/14/2021 (Paine, Matthew).
October 14, 2021 Filing 216 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #196 Motion to Intervene; denying #197 Motion to Intervene (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
October 14, 2021 Filing 215 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
October 12, 2021 Filing 214 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Mary Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center for proceedings held on 11/18/2020 before Judge William G. Young, (O'Neill, Julie)
October 8, 2021 Filing 213 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to #203 Notice of Appeal,,, #191 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,,,, by Intervenor Defendant State of Texas. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMADC-9000907. Payment Type : APPEAL. (Walton, Kenneth)
September 28, 2021 Filing 212 USCA Case Number 21-1773 for #192 Notice of Appeal, filed by Independent Women's Law Center, Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Speech First, Inc.. (Paine, Matthew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 211 USCA Case Number 21-1784 for #202 Notice of Appeal, filed by Families Advocating for Campus Equality. (Paine, Matthew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 210 USCA Case Number 21-1783 for #201 Notice of Appeal, filed by Steve Doe, John Doe, Zachary Doe. (Paine, Matthew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 209 USCA Case Number 21-1782 for #198 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anne Doe, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Nancy Doe, Victim Rights Law Center, Jane Doe, Lisa Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Mary Doe, Susan Doe, Sobia Doe, Equal Rights Advocates. (Paine, Matthew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 208 USCA Case Number 21-1777 for #191 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by State of Texas. (Paine, Matthew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 207 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #203 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 206 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #202 Notice of Appeal (Paine, Matthew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 205 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #201 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 204 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #198 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
September 27, 2021 Filing 203 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #183 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law,, by State of Texas Fee Status: State or Local Government. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/18/2021. (Walton, Kenneth)
September 27, 2021 Filing 202 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #183 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law,, #186 Order on Motion for Clarification by Families Advocating for Campus Equality Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number BMADC-8978679 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/18/2021. (Brooks, Douglas)
September 27, 2021 Filing 201 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #183 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law,, #186 Order on Motion for Clarification by John Doe, Steve Doe, Zachary Doe Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number BMADC-8978668 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/18/2021. (Brooks, Douglas)
September 27, 2021 Filing 200 MEMORANDUM in Support re #197 MOTION to Intervene filed by Families Advocating for Campus Equality. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 (Protective) Notice of Appeal)(Brooks, Douglas)
September 27, 2021 Filing 199 MEMORANDUM in Support re #196 MOTION to Intervene filed by John Doe, Steve Doe, Zachary Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 (Protective) Notice of Appeal)(Brooks, Douglas)
September 27, 2021 Filing 198 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #183 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law,, by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Mary Doe Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number BMADC-8978569 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/18/2021. (O'Neill, Julie)
September 27, 2021 Filing 197 MOTION to Intervene by Families Advocating for Campus Equality. (Attachments: #5 Text of Proposed Order, (Brooks, Douglas) Modified on 9/27/2021 (Paine, Matthew).
September 27, 2021 Filing 196 MOTION to Intervene by John Doe, Steve Doe, Zachary Doe. (Attachments: #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooks, Douglas) Modified on 9/27/2021 (Paine, Matthew).
September 27, 2021 Filing 195 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #187 Motion to Intervene as Defendant, or Alternatively for Purposes of Appeal by State of Texas. The State of Texas is permitted to intervene for the sole purpose of pursuing an appeal from this Court's final judgment. It's purported answer is stricken as untimely, having been filed after final judgment. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
September 27, 2021 Filing 194 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #192 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
September 27, 2021 Filing 193 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #191 CONDITIONAL NOTICE APPEAL. (Paine, Matthew)
September 24, 2021 Filing 192 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #183 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law,, #186 Order on Motion for Clarification by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Independent Women's Law Center, Speech First, Inc. Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number AMADC-8975691 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/14/2021. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
September 24, 2021 Filing 191 CONDITIONAL NOTICE APPEAL as to #183 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law,, by State of Texas. ( (Fee Status: Filing Fee - Not Paid )) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/14/2021. (Walton, Kenneth) Modified on 9/25/2021 to Correct Docket Text and Filing Fee Information as the Filing Fee Was NOT PAID (Paine, Matthew).
September 24, 2021 Filing 190 ANSWER to #168 Amended Complaint, by State of Texas.(Walton, Kenneth)
September 24, 2021 Filing 189 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #187 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant, or Alternatively for Purposes of Appeal by Kenneth B. Walton on behalf of State of Texas. (Walton, Kenneth)
September 24, 2021 Filing 188 MEMORANDUM in Support re #187 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant, or Alternatively for Purposes of Appeal filed by State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Walton, Kenneth)
September 24, 2021 Filing 187 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant, or Alternatively for Purposes of Appeal by State of Texas.(Walton, Kenneth)
August 10, 2021 Filing 186 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered granting #185 Motion for Clarification (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
August 9, 2021 Filing 185 Joint MOTION for Clarification by Elizabeth D. DeVos, Kimberly Richey, U.S. Department of Education.(Kopplin, Rebecca)
July 28, 2021 Filing 184 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #177 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, Documents included: ECF No. 183 (Paine, Matthew)
July 28, 2021 Filing 183 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. FINDINGS OF FACT, RULINGS OF LAW, AND ORDER FOR JUDGMENT For these reasons, the Court finds and rules and, thus declares, that with the exception of section 106.45 (b) (6) (i)'s prohibition on all statements not subject to cross-examination, the Final Rule does not violate the APA or the Fifth Amendment. The prohibition in section 106.45 (b) (6) (i) is REMANDED to the agency for further consideration and explanation for the reasons articulated in Section IV.B.2.b.SO ORDERED.(Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
July 21, 2021 Filing 182 Case Appealed to Supreme Court of the United States, Case Number 21-84. (Paine, Matthew)
June 28, 2021 Filing 181 NOTICE by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center of Issuance of Unified Regulatory Agenda (Harris, Evan)
June 17, 2021 Filing 180 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to #177 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,,, by Intervenor Defendant State of Texas. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0101-8825132. Payment Type : APPEAL. (Walton, Kenneth)
June 3, 2021 Filing 179 USCA Case Number 21-1445 for #177 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by State of Texas. (Paine, Matthew)
June 2, 2021 Filing 178 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #177 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
June 2, 2021 Filing 177 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 170 Order on Motion to Intervene, by State of Texas. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 6/22/2021. (Walton, Kenneth)
June 1, 2021 Filing 176 AMICUS BRIEF filed by State of Texas . (Walton, Kenneth) (Main Document 176 replaced on 6/2/2021) (Paine, Matthew).
May 27, 2021 Filing 175 NOTICE by Elizabeth D. DeVos, Kenneth L. Marcus, Kimberly Richey, U.S. Department of Education NOTICE OF PUBLIC HEARING BY THE DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Kopplin, Rebecca)
May 21, 2021 Filing 174 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #172 MOTION Relief from Order Denying Pro Hac Vice Motion re 171 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Kenneth B. Walton on behalf of State of Texas. (Walton, Kenneth)
May 21, 2021 Filing 173 MEMORANDUM in Support re #172 MOTION Relief from Order Denying Pro Hac Vice Motion re 171 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear filed by State of Texas. (Walton, Kenneth)
May 21, 2021 Filing 172 MOTION Relief from Order Denying Pro Hac Vice Motion re 171 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by State of Texas.(Walton, Kenneth)
May 12, 2021 Filing 171 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #169 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
May 12, 2021 Filing 170 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #164 Motion to Intervene as Defendant by State of Texas. Motion is denied as untimely and without merit. The likelihood of internal review by the agency affords no grounds for intervention. The Court will, however, welcome a brief amici curiae filed within 20 days of the date of this order. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
May 11, 2021 Filing 169 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kathleen T. Hunker, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8768654 by State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Walton, Kenneth)
April 30, 2021 Filing 167 ANSWER to #168 Second Amended Complaint by State of Texas.(Walton, Kenneth) Modified on 5/3/2021 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Document Link to Second Amended. Counsel filed the answer prior to the Second Amended Complaint Being Filed. (Paine, Matthew).
April 30, 2021 Filing 166 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #164 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by Kenneth B. Walton on behalf of State of Texas. (Walton, Kenneth)
April 30, 2021 Filing 165 MEMORANDUM in Support re #164 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by State of Texas. (Walton, Kenneth)
April 30, 2021 Filing 164 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walton, Kenneth)
April 12, 2021 Filing 163 MANDATE of USCA as to #52 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Independent Women's Law Center, Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Speech First, Inc.. Appeal #52 Terminated (Paine, Matthew)
April 8, 2021 Filing 162 NOTICE by Elizabeth D. DeVos, Kenneth L. Marcus, U.S. Department of Education of Letter by the Department of Education (Kopplin, Rebecca)
March 8, 2021 Filing 161 NOTICE by Elizabeth D. DeVos, Kenneth L. Marcus, U.S. Department of Education of Executive Order (Kopplin, Rebecca)
February 18, 2021 Filing 160 USCA Judgment as to #52 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Independent Women's Law Center, Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Speech First, Inc.. AFFIRMED... (Paine, Matthew)
February 18, 2021 Filing 159 OPINION of USCA as to #52 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Independent Women's Law Center, Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Speech First, Inc.. (Paine, Matthew)
February 18, 2021 Filing 158 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #156 Consent Motion for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
February 5, 2021 Filing 157 DECLARATION re 154 Order,, of Plaintiff Mary Doe - Supplemental by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration, #2 Original Declaration)(Harris, Evan)
February 5, 2021 Filing 156 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Evan)
February 3, 2021 Filing 155 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #30 Motion to Expedite; finding as moot #64 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
January 28, 2021 Filing 154 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Plaintiff shall by February 5, 2021 file an amended declaration to reflect recent factual developments relating to Mary Doe, including those developments referenced in Counsels December 12, 2020 letter, ECF No. 148, in addition to the universitys Title IX hearing procedures as they relate to the regulation at issue. To the extent the defendants object to the Courts consideration of this material, defendants are granted leave to file an opposition to that effect by February 3, 2021. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
January 19, 2021 Filing 153 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by David A. Newman as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Newman, David)
January 13, 2021 Filing 152 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Roy L. Austin (Austin, Roy)
January 11, 2021 Filing 151 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer B. Dickey (Dickey, Jennifer)
December 15, 2020 Filing 150 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by David A. Newman (Newman, David)
December 14, 2020 Filing 149 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Elizabeth D. DeVos, Kenneth L. Marcus, U.S. Department of Education (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of the AR, #2 Exhibit Index to supplement to the AR)(Kopplin, Rebecca)
December 10, 2020 Filing 148 Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiffs advising the Court of developments with the Title IX Complaint filed by Mary Doe. (Newman, David)
November 30, 2020 Filing 147 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Elizabeth D. DeVos, Kenneth L. Marcus, U.S. Department of Education (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of the AR, #2 Exhibit Index to supplement to the AR)(Kopplin, Rebecca)
November 18, 2020 Filing 146 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Bench Trial held on 11/18/2020 by video. The Court enters an order granting #138 Consent Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.) After hearing arguments of counsel, the Court takes the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Attorneys Newman and Fleming Nolen for the plaintiffs and Attorney Mascott for the defendant) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 5, 2020 Filing 145 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Newman, David)
November 5, 2020 Filing 144 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Elizabeth D. DeVos, Kenneth L. Marcus, U.S. Department of Education. (Kopplin, Rebecca)
October 28, 2020 Filing 143 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Elizabeth D. DeVos, Kenneth L. Marcus, U.S. Department of Education (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index to supplement to the AR, #2 Exhibit Certification of AR)(Kopplin, Rebecca)
October 9, 2020 Filing 142 Judge William G. Young: ORDER Governing Proceedings entered. ( Bench Trial reset for 11/12/2020 at 2:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young.)(Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 9, 2020 Filing 141 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #140 Joint Motion for Order to issue an Order Governing the Proceedings by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 8, 2020 Filing 140 Joint MOTION for Order to to issue an Order Governing the Proceedings by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newman, David)
October 7, 2020 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Mascott on behalf of U.S. Department of Education (Mascott, Jennifer)
October 2, 2020 Filing 138 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 2nd Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B redline 2nd Amended Complaint)(Newman, David)
September 17, 2020 Filing 137 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Belpedio, Lisa)
September 17, 2020 Filing 136 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on September 2, 2020, before Judge William G. Young. COA Case No. 20-1748. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. Redaction Request due 10/8/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2020. (Belpedio, Lisa)
September 11, 2020 Filing 135 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #133 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 14 days after ruling on merits to File Answer. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
September 10, 2020 Filing 134 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Elizabeth D. DeVos, Kenneth L. Marcus, U.S. Department of Education (Kopplin, Rebecca)
September 10, 2020 Filing 133 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 14 days after ruling on merits to File Answer re #13 Amended Complaint, by Elizabeth D. DeVos, Kenneth L. Marcus, U.S. Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven)
September 10, 2020 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Myers on behalf of Elizabeth D. DeVos, Kenneth L. Marcus, U.S. Department of Education (Myers, Steven)
September 4, 2020 Filing 131 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #129 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Jesse R. Binnall. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
September 2, 2020 Filing 130 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 9/2/2020 by video re #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Stay Pending Judicial Review filed by Anne Doe, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Nancy Doe, Victim Rights Law Center, Jane Doe, Lisa Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Susan Doe, Sobia Doe, Equal Rights Advocates. The Court enters an order dismissing University of California, Santa Barbara and Harvard University without prejudice to the filing within 30 days a motion for leave to file an amended complaint. The motion for preliminary injunction is collapsed with trial on the merits in accordance with Rule 65A and set for hearing on October 14, 2020 at 9:00 AM. Counsel are instructed to notify the Court at their earliest convenience whether evidence need by received. ( Bench Trial (hearing on the merits) set for 10/14/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.) (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Attorneys Patel, Newman and Fleming-Nolen for the plaintiffs, Attorney Dickey for the defendants) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
September 2, 2020 Filing 129 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jesse R. Binnall Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8400325 by Stop Abusive and Violent Environments. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jesse R. Binnall in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Davis, Tara)
September 1, 2020 Filing 128 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #127 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Cynthia P. Garrett. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
August 31, 2020 Filing 127 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Cynthia P. Garrett Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8396731 by Families Advocating for Campus Equality. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cynthia P. Garrett, Esq.)(Davis, Tara)
August 27, 2020 Filing 126 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Families Advocating for Campus Equality as Amicus Curiae in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction of Section 705 Stay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Students, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff Demographics in Accused Student Lawsuits)(Davis, Tara)
August 26, 2020 Filing 125 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #123 Consent MOTION for Leave to File AMICUS BRIEF ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
August 25, 2020 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer B. Dickey on behalf of Elizabeth D. DeVos, Kenneth L. Marcus, U.S. Department of Education (Dickey, Jennifer)
August 21, 2020 Filing 123 Consent MOTION for Leave to File AMICUS BRIEF by Families Advocating for Campus Equality . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit Students, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff Demographics in Accused Student Lawsuits, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed)(Davis, Tara) (Modified on 8/26/2020 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event as Counsel Filed the Motion for Leave to File Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF) (Paine, Matthew).
August 20, 2020 Filing 122 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Law Professors . (Austin, Roy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 121 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Survivors of Sexual Violence . (Cloutier, Lisa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 120 AMICUS BRIEF filed by American Men's Studies Association, CONNECT, Inc., Jana's Campaign, Inc., Men Stopping Violence, Men and Masculinities Knowledge Community, Men's Story Project, North American MenEngage Network, Promundo, Ten Men - Rhode Island Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Vera House, Inc. . (Khouri, Lauren)
August 18, 2020 Filing 119 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Stop Abusive and Violent Environments . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Comment and Recommendations on Proposed Rulemaking, #2 Exhibit SAVE has Collected Research, Data, and Case Summaries to Demonstrate how Due Process is Compromised for Male Accused Students in Title IX Proceedings., #3 Exhibit Non Exhaustive List of Universities That Have Come Into Compliance)(Davis, Tara)
August 18, 2020 Filing 118 AMICUS BRIEF filed by American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, American Association of University Women, American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIO, American Humanist Association, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Clearinghouse on Womens Issues, Education Law Center-PA, Feminist Majority Foundation, GLSEN, Japanese American Citizens League, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, League of United Latin American Citizens, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, National Center for Transgender Equality, National Council of Jewish Women, National LGBTQ Task Force, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center . (Kehlmann, Geoffrey)
August 18, 2020 Filing 117 AMICUS BRIEF filed by American Council on Education and 24 Other Higher Education Organizations as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction or 5 U.S.C. Section 705 Stay. (Noonan, Gregory)
August 18, 2020 Filing 116 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Members of Congress in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction or Section 705 Stay. (Shapanka, Matthew)
August 18, 2020 Filing 115 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #105 Consent Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Stop Abusive and Violent Environments. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 114 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #89 Consent Motion for Leave to File Corrected Brief of Amici Curiae Members of Congress in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction or Section 705 Stay by Members of Congress. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 113 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #85 Consent Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief of Members of Congress in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction or Section 705 Stay by Members of Congress. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 112 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #84 Consent Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by American Men's Studies Association, CONNECT, Inc., Jana's Campaign, Inc., Men Stopping Violence, Men and Masculinities Knowledge Community, Men's Story Project, North American MenEngage Network, Promundo, Ten Men - Rhode Island Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Vera House, Inc. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 111 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #82 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by California Women's Law Center. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 110 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #74 Consent Motion for Leave to File Brief of Survivors of Sexual Violence as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction or Section 705 Stay by Survivors of Sexual Violence. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 109 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #72 First Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Law Professors. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 108 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #68 Consent Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction or 5 U.S.C. Sec. 705 Stay by Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities, Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Council of Independent Colleges, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASP - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, New England Commission of Higher Education, University Risk Management and Insurance Association, WASC Senior College and University Commission. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 107 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #55 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Daniel Jaffe on behalf of AASA, The School Superintendents' Association, The Council of the Great City Schools, National Association of Secondary School Principals. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 106 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #39 Consent Motion for Leave to File Brief Of The Civil Rights And Advocacy Amici As Amici Curiae In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction by American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, American Association of University Women, American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIO, American Humanist Association, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Clearinghouse on Womens Issues, Education Law Center-PA, Feminist Majority Foundation, GLSEN, Japanese American Citizens League, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, League of United Latin American Citizens, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, National Center for Transgender Equality, National Council of Jewish Women, National LGBTQ Task Force, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 17, 2020 Filing 105 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Stop Abusive and Violent Environments . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit Comment and Recommendations on Proposed Rulemaking, Docket ID ED-2018-OCR-0064-0001 Nondiscrimination on the Basis of Sex in Education Programs or Activities Receiving Federal Financial Assistance., #3 Exhibit SAVE has Collected Research, Data, and Case Summaries to Demonstrate how Due Process is Compromised for Male Accused Students in Title IX Proceedings., #4 Exhibit Non Exhaustive List Of Universities That Have Come Into Compliance)(Davis, Tara) Modified on 8/17/2020 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Filing Event as Counsel Filed the Motion for Leave Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew).
August 13, 2020 Filing 104 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Stay Pending Judicial Review (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kopplin, Rebecca)
August 13, 2020 Filing 103 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #100 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #101 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Emily J. Martin and Sunu P. Chandy. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
August 13, 2020 Filing 102 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #99 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint. Elizabeth D. DeVos answer/response due 9/14/2020; Kenneth L. Marcus answer/response due 9/14/2020; U.S. Department of Education answer/response due 9/14/2020. (Paine, Matthew)
August 12, 2020 Filing 101 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sunu P. Chandy Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8371381 by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Sunu P. Chandy)(O'Neill, Julie)
August 12, 2020 Filing 100 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Emily J. Martin Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8370115 by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Emily J. Martin)(O'Neill, Julie)
August 11, 2020 Filing 99 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to September 14, 2020 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint ( Responses due by 8/25/2020) by Elizabeth D. DeVos, Kenneth L. Marcus, U.S. Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kopplin, Rebecca) Modified on 8/12/2020 to Correct Docket Text and Remove CM/ECF Filing Event (Paine, Matthew).
August 10, 2020 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Stay Pending Judicial Review filed by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center. (Newman, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 97 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Stay Pending Judicial Review (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kopplin, Rebecca)
August 5, 2020 Filing 96 Opposition re #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Stay Pending Judicial Review filed by Elizabeth D. DeVos, Kenneth L. Marcus, U.S. Department of Education. (Kopplin, Rebecca)
August 5, 2020 Filing 95 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #92 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #93 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #94 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Elizabeth Tang, Neena Chaudhry, and Shiwali G. Patel. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
August 4, 2020 Filing 94 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Shiwali G. Patel Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8358666 by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center.(O'Neill, Julie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2020: #1 Exhibit A) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 94 replaced on 8/4/2020) (Paine, Matthew).
August 4, 2020 Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Neena Chaudhry Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8358655 by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center.(O'Neill, Julie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2020: #1 Exhibit A) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 93 replaced on 8/4/2020) (Paine, Matthew).
August 4, 2020 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Elizabeth Tang Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8358645 by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center.(O'Neill, Julie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2020: #1 Exhibit A) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 92 replaced on 8/4/2020) (Paine, Matthew).
August 4, 2020 Filing 91 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #90 MOTION to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Motion denied. A prompt September hearing is fully appropriate under all the circumstances. Counsel ought be looking beyond this hearing to a prompt trial on the merits. (Paine, Matthew)
August 3, 2020 Filing 90 MOTION to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newman, David)
August 3, 2020 Filing 89 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Brief of Amici Curiae Members of Congress in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction or Section 705 Stay by Members of Congress. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Corrected Brief of Amici Curiae in support of Plaintiff)(Shapanka, Matthew)
August 3, 2020 Filing 88 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #81 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Amy Poyer. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
August 3, 2020 Filing 87 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #79 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Lauren Khouri. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
August 1, 2020 Filing 86 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Matthew S. Shapanka on behalf of Members of Congress. (Shapanka, Matthew)
July 31, 2020 Filing 85 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief of Members of Congress in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction or Section 705 Stay by Members of Congress. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae Members of Congress)(Shapanka, Matthew)
July 31, 2020 Filing 84 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by American Men's Studies Association, CONNECT, Inc., Jana's Campaign, Inc., Men Stopping Violence, Men and Masculinities Knowledge Community, Men's Story Project, North American MenEngage Network, Promundo, Ten Men - Rhode Island Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Vera House, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief of Promundo, et al. as Amici Curiae)(Correia, Linda)
July 31, 2020 Filing 83 AMICUS BRIEF filed by California Women's Law Center . (Knuuttila, Kristin) (Main Document 83 replaced on 8/3/2020) (Paine, Matthew). Document Stricken from the Docket as Counsel Filed the Document Incorrectly - See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Section (R). (Paine, Matthew).
July 31, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by California Women's Law Center.(Knuuttila, Kristin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2020: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief) (Paine, Matthew).
July 31, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Amy Poyer Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8355520 by California Women's Law Center.(Knuuttila, Kristin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2020: #1 Exhibit A) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 81 replaced on 8/3/2020) (Paine, Matthew).
July 31, 2020 Filing 80 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #75 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Aleksandra O. Rushing, Allen F. James, and Paige Duggins-Clay. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
July 31, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lauren Khouri Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8355431 by American Men's Studies Association, CONNECT, Inc., Jana's Campaign, Inc., Men Stopping Violence, Men and Masculinities Knowledge Community, Men's Story Project, North American MenEngage Network, Promundo, Ten Men - Rhode Island Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Vera House, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Khouri)(Correia, Linda)
July 31, 2020 Filing 78 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #70 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #71 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #73 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Ellen L. Eardley, Cari S. Simon, and Saul E. Wolf. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
July 31, 2020 Filing 77 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #62 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #65 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #66 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Roy Austin, Lauren E. Snyder, and Daniel Tingley. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
July 31, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda M. Correia on behalf of Promundo, American Men's Studies Association, CONNECT, Inc., Jana's Campaign, Inc., Men Stopping Violence, Men's Story Project, Men and Masculinities Knowledge Community, North American MenEngage Network, Ten Men - Rhode Island Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Vera House, Inc. (Correia, Linda)
July 31, 2020 Filing 75 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Aleksandra O. Rushing, Allen F. James, Paige Duggins-Clay Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-8355033 by AASA, The School Superintendents' Association, National Association of Secondary School Principals, The Council of the Great City Schools. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Aleksandra Rushing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Allen James, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Paige Duggins-Clay)(Jaffe, Daniel)
July 31, 2020 Filing 74 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Survivors of Sexual Violence as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction or Section 705 Stay by Survivors of Sexual Violence. (Attachments: #1 Brief of Survivors of Sexual Violence as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction or Section 705 Stay)(Cloutier, Lisa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Saul E. Wolf Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8354651 by Survivors of Sexual Violence. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Saul E. Wolf)(Cloutier, Lisa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 72 First MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Motion)(Mann, Naomi)
July 31, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Cari S. Simon Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8354641 by Survivors of Sexual Violence. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Cari S. Simon)(Cloutier, Lisa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ellen L. Eardley Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8354622 by Survivors of Sexual Violence. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Ellen L. Eardley)(Cloutier, Lisa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa N. Cloutier on behalf of Survivors of Sexual Violence (Cloutier, Lisa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 68 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction or 5 U.S.C. Sec. 705 Stay by Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities, Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Council of Independent Colleges, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASP - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, New England Commission of Higher Education, University Risk Management and Insurance Association, WASC Senior College and University Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Noonan, Gregory)
July 31, 2020 Filing 67 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #61 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added John W. Borkowski. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
July 31, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daniel Tingley by Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Paine, Matthew)
July 31, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lauren E. Snyder by Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Paine, Matthew)
July 31, 2020 Filing 64 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Elizabeth D. DeVos, Kenneth L. Marcus, U.S. Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kopplin, Rebecca)
July 31, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory F Noonan on behalf of American Council on Education, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Association of University Professors, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities, Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Council of Independent Colleges, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASP - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, New England Commission of Higher Education, University Risk Management and Insurance Association, WASC Senior College and University Commission (Noonan, Gregory)
July 30, 2020 Filing 62 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Roy Austin. Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-8353314 by Law Professors. (Mann, Naomi) Modified on 7/31/2020 (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 62 replaced on 7/31/2020) (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2020: #1 Exhibit A) (Paine, Matthew).
July 30, 2020 Filing 61 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John W. Borkowski Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8351871 by AASA, The School Superintendents' Association, National Association of Secondary School Principals, The Council of the Great City Schools. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit/Declaration of John W. Borkowski Supporting His Pro Hac Vice Application)(Jaffe, Daniel)
July 30, 2020 Filing 60 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AASA, The School Superintendents' Association. (Jaffe, Daniel)
July 30, 2020 Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Association of Secondary School Principals. (Jaffe, Daniel)
July 30, 2020 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Council of the Great City Schools. (Jaffe, Daniel)
July 30, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Jaffe on behalf of AASA, The School Superintendents' Association, National Association of Secondary School Principals, The Council of the Great City Schools (Jaffe, Daniel)
July 29, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to #52 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,,,, by Intervenor Defendants Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Independent Women's Law Center, Speech First, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0101-8351280. Payment Type : APPEAL. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
July 29, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Daniel Jaffe on behalf of AASA, The School Superintendents' Association, The Council of the Great City Schools, National Association of Secondary School Principals . (Attachments: #1 Brief Amicus Curiae)(Jaffe, Daniel) (Modified on 7/30/2020 to Correct Docket Text, Party Name, and CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
July 29, 2020 Filing 54 USCA Case Number 20-1748 for #52 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Independent Women's Law Center, Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Speech First, Inc.. (Paine, Matthew)
July 29, 2020 Filing 53 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #52 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
July 28, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 35 Order on Motion to Intervene, by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Independent Women's Law Center, Speech First, Inc.. ( (Fee Status: Filing Fee Not Paid)) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 8/17/2020. (Strawbridge, Patrick) (Modified on 7/29/2020 to Correct the Docket Text as the Filing Fee for the Notice of Appeal Was NOT Paid) (Paine, Matthew).
July 28, 2020 Filing 51 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entries 41-45 Returns of Service as to the Defendants Corrected Because: The Returns of Service Were Filed Under the Wrong Events in CM/ECF By Counsel David A. Newman. The Returns of Service Were Re-Docketed Under the Correct Events in CM/ECF and the Numerous Incorrect Answer Deadlines Removed. (Paine, Matthew)
July 28, 2020 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Department of Education by Equal Rights Advocates, Victim Rights Law Center, Anne Doe, Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Sobia Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Nancy Doe, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Lisa Doe. (Paine, Matthew)
July 28, 2020 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kenneth L. Marcus by Victim Rights Law Center, Anne Doe, Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Sobia Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Nancy Doe, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Lisa Doe. (Paine, Matthew)
July 28, 2020 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Elizabeth D. DeVos by Equal Rights Advocates, Victim Rights Law Center, Anne Doe, Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Sobia Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Nancy Doe, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Lisa Doe. (Paine, Matthew)
July 28, 2020 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to William Barr - United States Attorney General by Equal Rights Advocates, Victim Rights Law Center, Anne Doe, Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Sobia Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Nancy Doe, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Lisa Doe. (Paine, Matthew)
July 28, 2020 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Equal Rights Advocates, Victim Rights Law Center, Anne Doe, Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Sobia Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Nancy Doe, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Lisa Doe. served on 7/13/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Paine, Matthew)
July 28, 2020 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Equal Rights Advocates, Victim Rights Law Center, Anne Doe, Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Sobia Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Nancy Doe, Lisa Doe. U.S. Department of Education served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Equal Rights Advocates; Victim Rights Law Center; Anne Doe; Susan Doe; Jane Doe; Sobia Doe; Jill Doe; Legal Voice; Nancy Doe; Lisa Doe. (Newman, David)
July 28, 2020 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Equal Rights Advocates, Victim Rights Law Center, Anne Doe, Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Sobia Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Nancy Doe, Lisa Doe. Acknowledgement filed by Equal Rights Advocates, Victim Rights Law Center, Anne Doe, Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Sobia Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Nancy Doe, Lisa Doe. (Newman, David)
July 28, 2020 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Victim Rights Law Center, Anne Doe, Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Sobia Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Nancy Doe, Lisa Doe. Kenneth L. Marcus served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Victim Rights Law Center; Anne Doe; Susan Doe; Jane Doe; Sobia Doe; Jill Doe; Legal Voice; Nancy Doe; Lisa Doe. (Newman, David)
July 28, 2020 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Victim Rights Law Center, Anne Doe, Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Sobia Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Nancy Doe, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Lisa Doe. William Barr served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Victim Rights Law Center; Anne Doe; Susan Doe; Jane Doe; Sobia Doe; Jill Doe; Legal Voice; Nancy Doe; Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation; Lisa Doe. (Newman, David)
July 28, 2020 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Equal Rights Advocates, Victim Rights Law Center, Anne Doe, Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Sobia Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Nancy Doe, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Lisa Doe. Elizabeth D. DeVos served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Equal Rights Advocates; Victim Rights Law Center; Anne Doe; Susan Doe; Jane Doe; Sobia Doe; Jill Doe; Legal Voice; Nancy Doe; Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation; Lisa Doe. (Newman, David)
July 28, 2020 Filing 40 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Geoffrey B. Kehlmann, Cynthia E. Tobisman, and David Hinojosa. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
July 27, 2020 Filing 39 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief Of The Civil Rights And Advocacy Amici As Amici Curiae In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction by American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, American Association of University Women, American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIO, American Humanist Association, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Clearinghouse on Womens Issues, Education Law Center-PA, Feminist Majority Foundation, GLSEN, Japanese American Citizens League, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, League of United Latin American Citizens, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, National Center for Transgender Equality, National Council of Jewish Women, National LGBTQ Task Force, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center. (Attachments: #1 Brief Of The Civil Rights And Advocacy Amici As Amici Curiae In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction)(Sellstrom, Oren)
July 27, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Hinojosa Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8346771 by American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, American Association of University Women, American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIO, American Humanist Association, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Clearinghouse on Womens Issues, Education Law Center-PA, Feminist Majority Foundation, GLSEN, Japanese American Citizens League, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, League of United Latin American Citizens, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, National Center for Transgender Equality, National Council of Jewish Women, National LGBTQ Task Force, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Hinojosa in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Sellstrom, Oren)
July 27, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Cynthia E. Tobisman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8346705 by American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, American Association of University Women, American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIO, American Humanist Association, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Clearinghouse on Womens Issues, Education Law Center-PA, Feminist Majority Foundation, GLSEN, Japanese American Citizens League, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, League of United Latin American Citizens, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, National Center for Transgender Equality, National Council of Jewish Women, National LGBTQ Task Force, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Cynthia Tobisman in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Sellstrom, Oren)
July 27, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Geoffrey B. Kehlmann Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8346369 by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, American Association of University Women, American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIO, American Humanist Association, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center-PA, GLSEN, Japanese American Citizens League, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., League of United Latin American Citizens, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, National Center for Transgender Equality, National Council of Jewish Women, National LGBTQ Task Force, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, Feminist Majority Foundation, Clearinghouse on Womens Issues. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Geoffrey B. Kehlmann in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Sellstrom, Oren)
July 27, 2020 Filing 35 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #24 Motion to Intervene. The motion to intervene is denied as there is no adequate showing that the government will not adequately protect the proposed intervenors rights. The Court will, of course, welcome a brief amicus curiae from the proposed intervenors. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
July 27, 2020 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Stay Pending Judicial Review : Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2020 03:00 PM by video before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
July 24, 2020 Filing 33 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered granting #28 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and for an Expedited Briefing Schedule. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
July 24, 2020 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Support re #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Stay Pending Judicial Review filed by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Declaration of Lisa Doe, #2 Exhibit B. Declaration of Jill Doe, #3 Exhibit C. Declaration of Anne Doe, #4 Exhibit D. Declaration of Sobia Doe, #5 Exhibit E. Declaration of Susan Doe, #6 Exhibit F. Declaration of Nancy Doe, #7 Exhibit G. Declaration of Jane Doe, #8 Exhibit H. Declaration of VRLC, #9 Exhibit I. Declaration of ERA, #10 Exhibit J. Declaration of CAASE, #11 Exhibit K. Declaration of Legal Voice, #12 Exhibit L. Declaration of Judith Herman, #13 Exhibit M. Declaration of Michael Madowitz, #14 Exhibit N. Declaration of Nancy Chi Cantalupo, #15 Exhibit O. Declaration of Elizabeth Collins)(O'Neill, Julie)
July 24, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Stay Pending Judicial Review by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Neill, Julie)
July 24, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Motion to Intervene by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Independent Women's Law Center, Speech First, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
July 24, 2020 Filing 29 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Evan M. Harris. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
July 23, 2020 Filing 28 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and for an Expedited Briefing Schedule by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Neill, Julie)
July 23, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Evan M. Harris Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8342279 by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center.(O'Neill, Julie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2020: #1 Exhibit A) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 27 replaced on 7/24/2020) (Paine, Matthew).
July 21, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Independent Women's Law Center, Speech First, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
July 21, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Intervene filed by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Independent Women's Law Center, Speech First, Inc.. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
July 21, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Intervene by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Independent Women's Law Center, Speech First, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
July 19, 2020 Filing 23 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Natalie Fleming, Vanshika Vij, Robin A. Smith, Caitlin A. Crujido, and David A. Newman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
July 17, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David A. Newman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8334516 by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center.(O'Neill, Julie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Caitlin A. Crujido Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8334421 by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center.(O'Neill, Julie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robin A. Smith Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8334418 by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center.(O'Neill, Julie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Vanshika Vij Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8334414 by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center.(O'Neill, Julie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Natalie Fleming Nolen Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8334404 by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center.(O'Neill, Julie)
July 15, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
July 14, 2020 Filing 16 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (O'Neill, Julie)
July 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca M. Kopplin on behalf of Elizabeth D. DeVos, Kenneth L. Marcus, U.S. Department of Education (Kopplin, Rebecca)
July 6, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Amended Complaint Corrected Because: The Amended Complaint Was Filed Under the Wrong Event By Counsel. The Amended Complaint Was Re-Docketed Under Correct Event in CM/ECF and the New Parties Added to the Docket. Please See ECF No. #13 for the Corrected Amended Complaint. (Paine, Matthew)
July 6, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kenneth L. Marcus, U.S. Department of Education, Elizabeth D. DeVos, filed by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Jane Doe, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Jill Doe, Nancy Doe, Lisa Doe.(Paine, Matthew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center. Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. (O'Neill, Julie)
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Legal Voice, Equal Rights Advocates. (O'Neill, Julie)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Legal Voice, Equal Rights Advocates. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Dept. of Education, #2 Dept. of Education return receipt)(O'Neill, Julie)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Legal Voice, Equal Rights Advocates. (O'Neill, Julie)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Legal Voice, Equal Rights Advocates. Andrew E Lelling served on 6/15/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (O'Neill, Julie) (Modified on 7/6/2020 to Correct Answer Date As Counsel Entered the Wrong Date of Service as to the US Attorney for the District of Massachusetts) (Paine, Matthew).
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Elizabeth D. DeVos, Kenneth L. Marcus, U.S. Department of Education. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Victim Rights Law Center. (O'Neill, Julie)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Legal Voice. (O'Neill, Julie)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equal Rights Advocates. (O'Neill, Julie)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation. (O'Neill, Julie)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Kenneth L. Marcus, U.S. Department of Education, Elizabeth D. DeVos Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8278652 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Elizabeth DeVos, #3 Summons for DOE, #4 Summons for Kenneth Marcus, #5 Summons for US Attorney General)(O'Neill, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victim Rights Law Center et al v. DeVos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth D. DeVos
Represented By: Rebecca M. Kopplin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Dickey
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education
Represented By: Rebecca M. Kopplin
Represented By: Jennifer L. Mascott
Represented By: Jennifer B. Dickey
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L. Marcus
Represented By: Rebecca M. Kopplin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Dickey
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSA Andrew E Lelling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Richey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Legal Voice
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Natalie Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Emily J. Martin
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victim Rights Law Center
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Natalie Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Emily J. Martin
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Rights Advocates
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Natalie Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Emily J. Martin
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Natalie Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Emily J. Martin
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Doe
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Natalie Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Emily J. Martin
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Doe
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Natalie Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Emily J. Martin
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sobia Doe
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Natalie Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Emily J. Martin
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Natalie Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Emily J. Martin
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Doe
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Natalie Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Emily J. Martin
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Doe
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Natalie Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Emily J. Martin
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Doe
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Natalie Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Emily J. Martin
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National LGBTQ Task Force
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Vera House, Inc.
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Women's Law Center
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of Public and Land-grant Universities
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of College and University Business Officers
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: League of United Latin American Citizens
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Japanese American Citizens League
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Men's Studies Association
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Council of Independent Colleges
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Council of the Great City Schools
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Aleksandra O. Rushing
Represented By: Daniel Jaffe
Represented By: Allen F. James
Represented By: John W. Borkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: North American MenEngage Network
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GLSEN
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Autistic Self Advocacy Network
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Feminist Majority Foundation
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ten Men - Rhode Island Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Promundo
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Southeast Asia Resource Action Center
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: College and University Professional Association for Human Resources
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Law Professors
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of American Medical Colleges
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Men's Story Project
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: University Risk Management and Insurance Association
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NASP - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WASC Senior College and University Commission
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Clearinghouse on Womens Issues
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CONNECT, Inc.
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Humanist Association
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Men and Masculinities Knowledge Community
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AASA, The School Superintendents' Association
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Aleksandra O. Rushing
Represented By: Daniel Jaffe
Represented By: Allen F. James
Represented By: John W. Borkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Association of University Professors
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Association of University Women
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Council for Advancement and Support of Education
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Survivors of Sexual Violence
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Lisa N. Cloutier
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Council on Education
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Council of Jewish Women
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of Secondary School Principals
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Aleksandra O. Rushing
Represented By: Daniel Jaffe
Represented By: Allen F. James
Represented By: John W. Borkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New England Commission of Higher Education
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Association of Community Colleges
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Collegiate Athletic Association
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Center for Transgender Equality
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Dental Education Association
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Members of Congress
Represented By: Matthew S. Shapanka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Education Law Center-PA
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Indian Higher Education Consortium
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of American Universities
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jana's Campaign, Inc.
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Men Stopping Violence
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Association of State Colleges and Universities
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Middle States Commission on Higher Education
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Families Advocating for Campus Equality
Represented By: Tara Jill Davis
Represented By: Cynthia P. Garrett
Represented By: Douglas S. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Stop Abusive and Violent Environments
Represented By: Jesse R. Binnall
Represented By: Tara Jill Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Texas
Represented By: Kenneth B. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Independent Women's Law Center
Represented By: Patrick Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Speech First, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Foundation for Individual Rights in Education
Represented By: Patrick Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Douglas S. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Steve Doe
Represented By: Douglas S. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Zachary Doe
Represented By: Douglas S. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?