Vonleh et al v. Deutsche Lufthansa AG et al
Plaintiff: Adelaide Vonleh and Nicole Vonleh
Defendant: Brussels Airlines, United Airlines and Deutsche Lufthansa AG
Case Number: 1:2020cv11146
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Adelaide Vonleh, Nicole Vonleh. United Airlines waiver sent on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Muggeo, Louis)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Adelaide Vonleh, Nicole Vonleh. Deutsche Lufthansa AG waiver sent on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Muggeo, Louis)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Adelaide Vonleh, Nicole Vonleh. Brussels Airlines waiver sent on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Muggeo, Louis)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (adminn, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8289360 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Adelaide Vonleh, Nicole Vonleh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Muggeo, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vonleh et al v. Deutsche Lufthansa AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brussels Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Lufthansa AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelaide Vonleh
Represented By: Louis J. Muggeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Vonleh
Represented By: Louis J. Muggeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?