The Ann Wigmore Foundation, Inc. et al v. The Sterling Foundation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Ann Wigmore Foundation, Inc. and Susan Lynn Lavendar Baran
Defendant: Jessica Hatfield, William N. Ford, Sr., Reynold Greenleaf & Associates, LLC, The Sterling Foundation, Inc., R. Greenleaf Organics, Inc., John Christopher Romero, Maurice Sandifer, William Francis Galvin and Carl Scott Tillman
Case Number: 1:2020cv11150
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2020 03:15 PM before Judge Indira Talwani. Calling instructions will be provided to counsel by the clerk. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) is responsible for ensuring that all parties and/or their attorneys who have not filed an answer or appearance with the court are notified of the date of the scheduling conference. (MacDonald, Gail)
July 24, 2020 Filing 15 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: The request #11 for an extension of time to September 8, 2020, to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 is ALLOWED as unopposed as to Defendants The Sterling Foundation, Inc., R. Greenleaf Organics, Inc., Reynold Greenleaf & Associates, LLC, and William N. Ford Sr., see Response #14 , and is DENIED as moot as to Defendants Jessica Hatfield, John Christopher Romer, Carl Scott Tillman, and Maurice Sandifer in light of Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #13 of these Defendants. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 Response by Susan Lynn Lavendar Baran, The Ann Wigmore Foundation, Inc. to #11 Letter/request (non-motion) . (Markham, John)
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Susan Lynn Lavendar Baran, The Ann Wigmore Foundation, Inc. (Markham, John)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: Pending before the court is the letter request #11 of Defendants The Sterling Foundation, Inc., R. Greenleaf Organics, Inc., Reynold Greenleaf & Associates, LLC, and William N. Ford Sr. (the "served Sterling Defendants") and Defendants Jessica Hatfield, John Christopher Romer, Carl Scott Tillman, and Maurice Sandifer (the "unserved Sterling Defendants") seeking an extension of time to September 8, 2020, to file their response to Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 . The letter request represents that Plaintiffs agreed to extend time for twenty days only, and otherwise oppose the request. Plaintiffs shall file any response to the letter request by July 23, 2020. Pending that response, the court extends the served Sterling Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint by twenty days (to July 30, 2020). The further extension sought in the letter request #11 remains under advisement. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 9, 2020 Filing 11 1st Letter/request (non-motion) from Adam Fine for extension of time to respond to complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NM docket, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fine, Adam)
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam D. Fine on behalf of William N. Ford, Sr, Jessica Hatfield, R. Greenleaf Organics, Inc., Reynold Greenleaf & Associates, LLC, John Christopher Romero, Maurice Sandifer, The Sterling Foundation, Inc., Carl Scott Tillman (Fine, Adam)
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Reynold Greenleaf & Associates, LLC served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Markham, John)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed R. Greenleaf Organics, Inc. served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Markham, John)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed The Sterling Foundation, Inc. served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Markham, John)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed William N. Ford, Sr served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Markham, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget A. Zerner on behalf of Susan Lynn Lavendar Baran, The Ann Wigmore Foundation, Inc. (Zerner, Bridget)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Ann Wigmore Foundation, Inc.. (Markham, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8289891 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Susan Lynn Lavendar Baran, The Ann Wigmore Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Form)(Markham, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Ann Wigmore Foundation, Inc. et al v. The Sterling Foundation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Hatfield
Represented By: Adam D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William N. Ford, Sr.
Represented By: Adam D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynold Greenleaf & Associates, LLC
Represented By: Adam D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sterling Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Adam D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Greenleaf Organics, Inc.
Represented By: Adam D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Christopher Romero
Represented By: Adam D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Sandifer
Represented By: Adam D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Francis Galvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Scott Tillman
Represented By: Adam D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ann Wigmore Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: John J.E. Markham, II
Represented By: Bridget A. Zerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lynn Lavendar Baran
Represented By: John J.E. Markham, II
Represented By: Bridget A. Zerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?