Delaney v. Baker
Plaintiff: Vincent Delaney
Defendant: Charles D Baker
Case Number: 1:2020cv11154
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction Motion. (Spector, Amy)
August 14, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION) filed by Charles D Baker. (Spector, Amy)
August 14, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Charles D Baker.(Spector, Amy)
August 10, 2020 Filing 17 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Paine, Matthew)
August 7, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Charles D Baker.(Spector, Amy)
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION to Dismiss Count III, Count IV Partially and Count V Partially by Vincent Delaney.(Mason, Thomas)
July 31, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION for Injunctive Relief filed by Vincent Delaney. (Mason, Thomas)
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Vincent Delaney.(Mason, Thomas) (Modified on 7/31/2020 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event As Counsel Filed the Motion Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF) (Paine, Matthew).
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency by Vincent Delaney.(Mason, Thomas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency. Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2020 11:00 AM by video before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Joint Motion Submitting Scheduling Stipulation. Stipulation is approved. Motion hearing to be set for September 2, 2020 at 11:00 by video. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION Joint Scheduling Stipulation by Charles D Baker.(Martland, Douglas)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas S. Martland on behalf of Charles D Baker (Martland, Douglas)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Spector on behalf of Charles D Baker (Spector, Amy)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Vincent Delaney. Charles D Baker waiver sent on 7/9/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Mason, Thomas)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Charles D Baker. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency filed by Vincent Delaney. (Mason, Thomas)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency by Vincent Delaney.(Mason, Thomas)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8290431 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Vincent Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 2 & 3, #5 4, #6 5, #7 6)(Mason, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delaney v. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D Baker
Represented By: Amy Spector
Represented By: Douglas S. Martland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Delaney
Represented By: Thomas O. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?