F.H. Cann & Associates, Inc. v. McKinney
Plaintiff: F.H. Cann & Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Carlos McKinney
Case Number: 1:2020cv11180
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Joshua M. D. Segal in Support re #6 MOTION for Entry of Default pursuant to FRCP 55(a) filed by F.H. Cann & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FedEx Proof of Delivery)(Segal, Joshua)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default pursuant to FRCP 55(a) by F.H. Cann & Associates, Inc..(Segal, Joshua)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel H. Newburger on behalf of F.H. Cann & Associates, Inc. (Newburger, Manuel) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/2/2020) (Halley, Taylor).
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Carlos McKinney served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Segal, Joshua)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carlos McKinney. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Baker, Casey)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carlos McKinney Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8293295 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by F.H. Cann & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Category Sheet)(Segal, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: F.H. Cann & Associates, Inc. v. McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.H. Cann & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua M.D. Segal
Represented By: Manuel H. Newburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?