LEASE v. STRYKER CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL LEASE
Defendant: Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales Corporation and STRYKER ORTHOPAEDICS
Case Number: 1:2020cv11246
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 Judge Indira Talwani: MDL ORDERS NO. 1-13 entered, (Attachments: #1 Case Management Orders 1-6, #2 Protective Order, #3 ESI Order, #4 Fact Sheet Implementation Order, #5 Plaintiff Fact Sheet, #6 Defendant Fact Sheet, #7 Order Aiding Private Settlement, #8 Orders Extending Discovery Stay)(Jones, Sherry). Modified on 6/30/2020: Replaced attachment 8 with corrected Orders (Kelly, Danielle).
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number: 56, MDL No. 2768 has been transferred from Eastern District of Pennsylvania and assigned civil action number: 20-11246. Eastern District of Pennsylvania case number: 20-2785. In Re: Striker Orthopaedics LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation (Jones, Sherry)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (Jones, Sherry)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 5:20-cv-02785.
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE DISTRICT OF MASSACHUSETTS. TRANSFERRED TO JUDGE INDIRA TALWANI PURSUANT TO MDL TRANSFER ORDER NO. 56 (MDL 2768). 6/25/20 ENTERED(kw, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STRYKER CORPORATION.(FINLEY, STEPHEN)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STRYKER CORPORATION , COURT OF COMMON PLEAS BERKS COUNTY, case number 19-15093, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14347388), filed by STRYKER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(FINLEY, STEPHEN) Modified on 6/12/2020 (tjd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2020: #3 Case Management Track Form) (tjd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEASE v. STRYKER CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL LEASE
Represented By: EDWIN L. STOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Represented By: STEPHEN J. FINLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Sales Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STRYKER ORTHOPAEDICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?