Boston Alliance of Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Youth (BAGLY) et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Boston Alliance of Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Youth (BAGLY), Equality California, Campaign for Southern Equality, Fenway Health, Darren Lazor, Callen-Lorde Community Health Center and Transgender Emergency Fund of Massachusetts
Defendant: Seema Verma, Roger Severino, Alex M. Azar, II and United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv11297
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Maryanne I. Tomazic. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Baker, Casey)
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Maryanne I. Tomazic Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8364842 by Boston Alliance of Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Youth (BAGLY), Callen-Lorde Community Health Center, Campaign for Southern Equality, Equality California, Fenway Health, Darren Lazor, Transgender Emergency Fund of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Maryanne I. Tomazic)(Kettlewell, William)
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fenway Health, Campaign for Southern Equality, Transgender Emergency Fund of Massachusetts, Callen-Lorde Community Health Center, Boston Alliance of Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Youth (BAGLY), Darren Lazor, Equality California. (Kettlewell, William)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Fenway Health, Campaign for Southern Equality, Transgender Emergency Fund of Massachusetts, Callen-Lorde Community Health Center, Boston Alliance of Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Youth (BAGLY), Darren Lazor, Equality California. Alex M. Azar, II served on 7/15/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Roger Severino served on 7/15/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 7/15/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Seema Verma served on 7/15/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Kettlewell, William)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David Brown, Noah Lewis, and Alejandra Caraballo. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Baker, Casey)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michelle Banker, Dorianne Mason, Sunu Chandy, Lauren Gorodetsky, Dale Melchert, and Lynly Egyes. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Baker, Casey)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jessica Ellsworth, Kirti Datla, Jo-Ann Tamila Sagar, Erin Chapman, Kristina Alekseyeva, and Peter William Bautz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Baker, Casey)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Brown, Noah Lewis, and Alejandra Caraballo Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-8322371 by Boston Alliance of Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Youth (BAGLY), Callen-Lorde Community Health Center, Campaign for Southern Equality, Equality California, Fenway Health, Darren Lazor, Transgender Emergency Fund of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of David Brown, #2 Certificate of Noah Lewis, #3 Certificate of Alejandra Caraballo)(Kettlewell, William)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michelle Banker, Dorianne Mason, Sunu Chandy, Lauren Gorodetsky, Dale Melchert, and Lynly Egyes Filing fee: $ 600, receipt number 0101-8322369 by Boston Alliance of Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Youth (BAGLY), Callen-Lorde Community Health Center, Campaign for Southern Equality, Equality California, Fenway Health, Darren Lazor, Transgender Emergency Fund of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Michelle Banker, #2 Certificate of Dorianne Mason, #3 Certificate of Sunu Chandy, #4 Certificate of Lauren Gorodetsky, #5 Certificate of Dale Melchert, #6 Certificate of Lynly Egyes)(Kettlewell, William)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jessica Ellsworth, Kirti Datla, Jo-Ann Tamila Sagar, Erin Chapman, Kristina Alekseyeva, and Peter William Bautz Filing fee: $ 600, receipt number 0101-8322363 by Boston Alliance of Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Youth (BAGLY), Callen-Lorde Community Health Center, Campaign for Southern Equality, Equality California, Fenway Health, Darren Lazor, Transgender Emergency Fund of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Jessica Ellsworth, #2 Certificate of Kirti Datla, #3 Certificate of Jo-Ann Tamila Sagar,, #4 Certificate of Erin Chapman, #5 Certificate of Kristina Alekseyeva, #6 Certificate of Peter William Bautz)(Kettlewell, William)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Costello on behalf of Boston Alliance of Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Youth (BAGLY), Callen-Lorde Community Health Center, Campaign for Southern Equality, Equality California, Fenway Health, Darren Lazor, Transgender Emergency Fund of Massachusetts (Costello, Kevin)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Seema Verma, Alex M. Azar, II, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Roger Severino Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8322344 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Boston Alliance of Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Youth (BAGLY), Callen-Lorde Community Health Center, Campaign for Southern Equality, Equality California, Fenway Health, Darren Lazor, Transgender Emergency Fund of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local Civil Category Form, #3 Summons - William P. Barr, #4 Summons - Alex M. Azar, II, #5 Summons - U.S. Attorney for the District of Massachusetts, #6 Summons - U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, #7 Summons - Roger Severino, #8 Summons - Seema Verma)(Kettlewell, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boston Alliance of Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Youth (BAGLY) et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Alliance of Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Youth (BAGLY)
Represented By: Kevin Costello
Represented By: William H. Kettlewell
Represented By: Michelle Banker
Represented By: Kristina Alekseyeva
Represented By: Jo-Ann Sagar
Represented By: Noah Lewis
Represented By: Lauren Gorodetsky
Represented By: Erin Chapman
Represented By: Lynly Egyes
Represented By: Maryanne I. Tomazic
Represented By: Kirti Datla
Represented By: David Brown
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Represented By: Dorianne Mason
Represented By: Dale Melchert
Represented By: Peter William Bautz
Represented By: Alejandra Caraballo
Represented By: Jessica L. Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equality California
Represented By: Kevin Costello
Represented By: William H. Kettlewell
Represented By: Michelle Banker
Represented By: Kristina Alekseyeva
Represented By: Jo-Ann Sagar
Represented By: Noah Lewis
Represented By: Lauren Gorodetsky
Represented By: Erin Chapman
Represented By: Lynly Egyes
Represented By: Maryanne I. Tomazic
Represented By: Kirti Datla
Represented By: David Brown
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Represented By: Dorianne Mason
Represented By: Dale Melchert
Represented By: Peter William Bautz
Represented By: Alejandra Caraballo
Represented By: Jessica L. Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campaign for Southern Equality
Represented By: Kevin Costello
Represented By: William H. Kettlewell
Represented By: Michelle Banker
Represented By: Kristina Alekseyeva
Represented By: Jo-Ann Sagar
Represented By: Noah Lewis
Represented By: Lauren Gorodetsky
Represented By: Erin Chapman
Represented By: Lynly Egyes
Represented By: Maryanne I. Tomazic
Represented By: Kirti Datla
Represented By: David Brown
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Represented By: Dorianne Mason
Represented By: Dale Melchert
Represented By: Peter William Bautz
Represented By: Alejandra Caraballo
Represented By: Jessica L. Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fenway Health
Represented By: Kevin Costello
Represented By: William H. Kettlewell
Represented By: Michelle Banker
Represented By: Kristina Alekseyeva
Represented By: Jo-Ann Sagar
Represented By: Noah Lewis
Represented By: Lauren Gorodetsky
Represented By: Erin Chapman
Represented By: Lynly Egyes
Represented By: Maryanne I. Tomazic
Represented By: Kirti Datla
Represented By: David Brown
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Represented By: Dorianne Mason
Represented By: Dale Melchert
Represented By: Peter William Bautz
Represented By: Alejandra Caraballo
Represented By: Jessica L. Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Lazor
Represented By: Kevin Costello
Represented By: William H. Kettlewell
Represented By: Michelle Banker
Represented By: Kristina Alekseyeva
Represented By: Jo-Ann Sagar
Represented By: Noah Lewis
Represented By: Lauren Gorodetsky
Represented By: Erin Chapman
Represented By: Lynly Egyes
Represented By: Maryanne I. Tomazic
Represented By: Kirti Datla
Represented By: David Brown
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Represented By: Dorianne Mason
Represented By: Dale Melchert
Represented By: Peter William Bautz
Represented By: Alejandra Caraballo
Represented By: Jessica L. Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Callen-Lorde Community Health Center
Represented By: Kevin Costello
Represented By: William H. Kettlewell
Represented By: Michelle Banker
Represented By: Kristina Alekseyeva
Represented By: Jo-Ann Sagar
Represented By: Noah Lewis
Represented By: Lauren Gorodetsky
Represented By: Erin Chapman
Represented By: Lynly Egyes
Represented By: Maryanne I. Tomazic
Represented By: Kirti Datla
Represented By: David Brown
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Represented By: Dorianne Mason
Represented By: Dale Melchert
Represented By: Peter William Bautz
Represented By: Alejandra Caraballo
Represented By: Jessica L. Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transgender Emergency Fund of Massachusetts
Represented By: Kevin Costello
Represented By: William H. Kettlewell
Represented By: Michelle Banker
Represented By: Kristina Alekseyeva
Represented By: Jo-Ann Sagar
Represented By: Noah Lewis
Represented By: Lauren Gorodetsky
Represented By: Erin Chapman
Represented By: Lynly Egyes
Represented By: Maryanne I. Tomazic
Represented By: Kirti Datla
Represented By: David Brown
Represented By: Sunu Chandy
Represented By: Dorianne Mason
Represented By: Dale Melchert
Represented By: Peter William Bautz
Represented By: Alejandra Caraballo
Represented By: Jessica L. Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Severino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?