Stoute v. Talwani et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Stoute
Defendant: Judge Marianne B. Bowler, Judge Indira Talwani and Clerk Lisa Belpedio
Case Number: 1:2020cv11339
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nancy Torresen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 Copy re #7 Concurring Order mailed to Stephen Stoute on 07/30/2020. (Whitten, Melody)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 CONCURRING ORDER entered, assigning U.S. Magistrate Judge John C. Nivison. By Chief U.S. District Judge Judge Jon D. Levy. (Whitten, Melody)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER regarding the assignment of U.S. Magistrate Judge John C. Nivison from the District of Maine. (adminn, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. District Judge Nancy Torresen added. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV no longer assigned to case. (adminn, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE FOR SERVICE IN ANOTHER DISTRICT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT. Honorable Nancy Torresen, United States District Judge for the District of Maine, is designated to sit upon the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts as to Stoute v. Talwani et al.(adminn, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: "Under 28 U.S.C. 455(a), I hereby recuse myself from presiding over this proceeding." ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL. (Bono, Christine)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Stephen Stoute.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoute v. Talwani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Marianne B. Bowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Indira Talwani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk Lisa Belpedio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Stoute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?