Freedman v. Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Freedman and Jeffrey Greenberg
Defendant: DMO Noorwood, LLC, Dan O'Brien Auto Group and Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood
Case Number: 1:2020cv11369
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 24 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 9, 2020 to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the First Amended Class Action Complaint by Rachel Freedman, Jeffrey Greenberg.(Garick, Joshua)
September 2, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #17 MOTION for Leave to File 25-Page Memorandum of Law in Support of the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by DMO Noorwood, LLC, Dan O'Brien Auto Group, Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood. (Sackman, Edward)
September 1, 2020 Filing 22 STATE COURT Record. (Sackman, Edward)
September 1, 2020 Filing 21 Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by DMO Noorwood, LLC, Dan O'Brien Auto Group, Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Mitchell, Daniel)
August 27, 2020 Filing 20 Opposition re #17 MOTION for Leave to File 25-Page Memorandum of Law in Support of the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Cross-Motion to Strike filed by Rachel Freedman, Jeffrey Greenberg. (Garick, Joshua)
August 27, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by DMO Noorwood, LLC, Dan O'Brien Auto Group, Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Affidavit of Thomas Kuhn, #2 Exhibit 1A -- Monroney Sticker, #3 Exhibit 1B -- Addendum, #4 Exhibit 1C -- Motor Vehicle Purchase Agreement, #5 Exhibit 1D -- Certificate of Registration, #6 Exhibit 2 -- MA RMV Schedule of Fees)(Sackman, Edward)
August 27, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the First Amended Class Action Complaint by DMO Noorwood, LLC, Dan O'Brien Auto Group, Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood.(Sackman, Edward)
August 27, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File 25-Page Memorandum of Law in Support of the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by DMO Noorwood, LLC, Dan O'Brien Auto Group, Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood.(Sackman, Edward)
August 18, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Rachel Freedman, Jeffrey Greenberg. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A: 5/28/20 E-Mail Sending Complaint, #2 Ex. B: 5/29/20 E-Mail Accepting Service, #3 Ex. C: 6/26/20 E-Mail Extending Time to Respond)(Garick, Joshua)
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Rachel Freedman, Jeffrey Greenberg.(Garick, Joshua)
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dan O'Brien Auto Group, DMO Noorwood, LLC, Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood, filed by Rachel Freedman, Jeffrey Greenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Sample of Deceptive Addendum)(Garick, Joshua)
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered withdrawing #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #12 Motion to Amend (Urso, Lisa)
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Amend Complaint and Withdraw Motion to Dismiss by Rachel Freedman. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A: Proposed Amended Class Action Complaint)(Garick, Joshua)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by DMO Noorwood, LLC, Dan O'Brien Auto Group, Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood.(Sackman, Edward)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) filed by DMO Noorwood, LLC, Dan O'Brien Auto Group, Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A -- Sticker, #2 Exhibit 1B -- Addendum, #3 Exhibit 2 -- MA RMV Schedule of Fees)(Sackman, Edward)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) by DMO Noorwood, LLC, Dan O'Brien Auto Group, Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood.(Sackman, Edward)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Hilary Holmes Rheaume. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Currie, Haley)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Hilary Holmes Rheaume Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8346379 by DMO Noorwood, LLC, Dan O'Brien Auto Group, Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Declaration of Hilary Holmes Rheaume)(Sackman, Edward)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by DMO Noorwood, LLC, Dan O'Brien Auto Group, Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood re #1 Notice of Removal,, . (Mitchell, Daniel)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Sackman on behalf of DMO Noorwood, LLC, Dan O'Brien Auto Group, Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood (Sackman, Edward)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Currie, Haley)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DMO Noorwood, LLC, Dan O'Brien Auto Group, Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood. (Currie, Haley)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DMO Noorwood, LLC, Dan O'Brien Auto Group, Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8337681 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement - (document removed and filed as its own entry), #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Acceptance of Service, #5 Exhibit C - Declaration of Nathaniel Seguin, #6 Exhibit D - 93A Demand Letter)(Mitchell, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2020: #7 Category Sheet) (Currie, Haley).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedman v. Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMO Noorwood, LLC
Represented By: Edward J. Sackman
Represented By: Daniel J. Mitchell
Represented By: Hilary Holmes Rheaume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan O'Brien Auto Group
Represented By: Edward J. Sackman
Represented By: Daniel J. Mitchell
Represented By: Hilary Holmes Rheaume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan O'Brien Kia Norwood
Represented By: Edward J. Sackman
Represented By: Daniel J. Mitchell
Represented By: Hilary Holmes Rheaume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Freedman
Represented By: Joshua N. Garick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Greenberg
Represented By: Joshua N. Garick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?