Nucleus Research, Inc. v. Manhattan Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nucleus Research, Inc.
Defendant: Manhattan Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11389
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Manhattan Associates, Inc.. (Hyland, Amanda)
August 21, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Manhattan Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (USPTO Nucleus Records), #2 Exhibit 2 (Plaintiff's USPTO Arguments), #3 Affidavit Capel Declaration, #4 Affidavit Dorfman Declaration)(Hyland, Amanda)
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Manhattan Associates, Inc..(Hyland, Amanda)
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Amanda G. Hyland. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Currie, Haley)
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Amanda G. Hyland Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8362653 by Manhattan Associates, Inc..(Torres, Steven)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File to 8/21/2020. (Urso, Lisa)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 21, 2020 to File Opposition to Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Manhattan Associates, Inc..(Torres, Steven)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Torres on behalf of Manhattan Associates, Inc. (Torres, Steven)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3 Motion to Appoint Special Process Server. (Urso, Lisa)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Nucleus Research, Inc..(Woolf, Devin)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Woolf, Devin)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Manhattan Associates, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Report on Filing or Determination Re: Patent or Trademark AO 120. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms/Local Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Report on the filing of patent/trademark case. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Special Process Server by Nucleus Research, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Woolf, Devin)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Nucleus Research, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Affidavit Affidavit of Ian Campbell, #9 Notice of Motion, #10 Order to Show Cause)(Woolf, Devin)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8343293 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Nucleus Research, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category From, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Woolf, Devin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nucleus Research, Inc. v. Manhattan Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manhattan Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda G. Hyland
Represented By: Steven J. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nucleus Research, Inc.
Represented By: Devin R. Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?