Barksdale School Portraits, LLC v Hockmeyer Williams et al
Plaintiff: Barksdale School Portraits, LLC doing business as Hockmeyer With Barksdale and BSP New England, LLC doing business as Hockmeyer With Barksdale
Defendant: E-lluminations and Elizabeth Hockmeyer Williams
Counter Defendant: BSP New England, LLC and Barksdale School Portraits, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv11393
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 25 Assented to MOTION to Consolidate Cases this Action with District of Massachusetts Civil Action Number 1:20-cv-11640-IT for Certain Limited Purposes by E-lluminations, Elizabeth Hockmeyer Williams.(Rosin, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2020 Filing 24 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #22 Assented to Motion for Joinder to Amend Counterclaims to add Wayne Barksdale and Susan Sheridan, each Individually, as Counterclaim Defendants on Counterclaims Under Chapter 149. (Kelly, Danielle)
September 17, 2020 Filing 22 Assented to MOTION for Joinder to Amend Counterclaims to add Wayne Barksdale and Susan Sheridan, each Individually, as Counterclaim Defendants on Counterclaims Under Chapter 149 by E-lluminations, Elizabeth Hockmeyer Williams.(Rosin, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by BSP New England, LLC, Barksdale School Portraits, LLC of Citizenship of Members of LLCs (Dretler, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2020 Filing 20 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel following Rule 16 Conference. (Dretler, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by E-lluminations, Elizabeth Hockmeyer Williams Notice of Residence (Rosin, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2020 Filing 23 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Scheduling Conference held on 9/14/2020. Case called. Court had colloquy with counsel. Proposed dates adopted through fact discovery deadline of 5/7/2021. Counsel to file notice confirming jurisdiction. By c.o.b. 9/18/20, counsel will file a joint schedule re: preliminary motions and any request for ADR. The court encouraged clients to be present for court proceedings. Status Conference set for 5/11/2021 02:15 PM before Judge Indira Talwani. Scheduling Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Robert Paschal at rwp.reporter@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Jeffrey A. Dretler Michael Homans, Jeffrey M. Rosin) (MacDonald, Gail)
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Dretler, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2020 Filing 17 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Dretler, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Rosin, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, First CROSSCLAIM (if permitted) against All Plaintiffs, First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Elizabeth Hockmeyer Williams, E-lluminations.(Rosin, Jeffrey)
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2020 03:00 PM before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel are instructed to dial 888-808-6929 and enter Code: 8523158 to be connected to the court's teleconference system. (MacDonald, Gail)
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael D. Homans. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kelly, Danielle)
August 18, 2020 Filing 12 Filing fee/payment: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8378668 for #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael D. Homans. (Kelly, Danielle)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael D. Homans by BSP New England, LLC, Barksdale School Portraits, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael D. Homans) (Kelly, Danielle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #9 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 Amended Complaint. E-lluminations and Elizabeth Hockmeyer Williams answers due September 18, 2020. (Kelly, Danielle)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 18, 2020 to File Answer to First Amended Complaint by E-lluminations, Elizabeth Hockmeyer Williams.(Rosin, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed E-lluminations served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Dretler, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Elizabeth Hockmeyer Williams served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Dretler, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BSP New England, LLC. (Dretler, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Barksdale School Portraits, LLC, BSP New England, LLC.(Dretler, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/12/2020: Corrected docket text (Kelly, Danielle).
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Barksdale School Portraits, LLC. (Dretler, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8343579 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Barksdale School Portraits, LLC d/b/a Hockmeyer With Barksdale. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Dretler, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/24/2020: corrected docket text (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barksdale School Portraits, LLC v Hockmeyer Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-lluminations
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Rosin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Hockmeyer Williams
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Rosin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barksdale School Portraits, LLC doing business as Hockmeyer With Barksdale
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Dretler
Represented By: Michael D. Homans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BSP New England, LLC doing business as Hockmeyer With Barksdale
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Dretler
Represented By: Michael D. Homans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: BSP New England, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Dretler
Represented By: Michael D. Homans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Barksdale School Portraits, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Dretler
Represented By: Michael D. Homans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?