Norfolk & Dedham Fire Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Norfolk & Dedham Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC, Regal Beloit America, Inc. and Jakel Motors Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2020cv11394
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 Set Deadlines: Complete Service due by 12/2/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Jakel Motors Incorporated. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Simeone, Maria)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT , Leave to File Granted on September 2, 2020, against Broan-Nutone, LLC, Jakel Motors Incorporated, filed by Norfolk & Dedham Fire Insurance Company.(Hartman, Douglas)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the amended complaint for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Norfolk & Dedham Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Hartman, Douglas) Modified on 9/1/2020 to edit description and change event (Montes, Mariliz).
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 10/22/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8343584 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Norfolk & Dedham Fire Insurance Company, a/s/o Lois Kellerman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Hartman, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norfolk & Dedham Fire Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norfolk & Dedham Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas F. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Beloit America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jakel Motors Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?