Fusion Trade, Inc. v. NewPower Worldwide, LLC
Plaintiff: Fusion Trade, Inc. doing business as Fusion Worldwide
Defendant: NewPower Worldwide, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv11428
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to October 12, 2020 to Allow Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by NewPower Worldwide, LLC.(Pasek, Jameson)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jameson J. Pasek on behalf of NewPower Worldwide, LLC (Pasek, Jameson)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Chapin Columbia on behalf of Fusion Trade, Inc. (Columbia, Sarah)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fusion Trade, Inc.. NewPower Worldwide, LLC waiver sent on 7/29/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Rich, David)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fusion Trade, Inc.. (Kiely, Christian)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to NewPower Worldwide, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Rich on behalf of Fusion Trade, Inc. (Rich, David)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NewPower Worldwide, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8349642 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Fusion Trade, Inc. d/b/a Fusion Worldwide. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Category Form)(Kiely, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fusion Trade, Inc. v. NewPower Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewPower Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Jameson J. Pasek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fusion Trade, Inc. doing business as Fusion Worldwide
Represented By: David H. Rich
Represented By: Christian G. Kiely
Represented By: Sarah Chapin Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?