Gonzales v. Stryker Corporation
Plaintiff: Matthew Gonzales
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv11461
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (Meszaros, Katy)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/19/2020 (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered: re: #5 Motion to Stay. Motion ALLOWED; the parties are directed to file a joint status report on or before Thursday, November 19, 2020. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 9, 2020 to Respond to Complaint by Stryker Corporation.(Meszaros, Katy)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Stryker Corporation.(Meszaros, Katy)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail. (Baker, Casey)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stryker Corporation. (Meszaros, Katy)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Stryker Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8357524 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A)(Meszaros, Katy) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/3/2020) (Baker, Casey).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Stryker Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Represented By: Katy O. Meszaros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Gonzales
Represented By: Thomas C. Bixby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?