Koppel v. Moses
Plaintiff: James Koppel
Defendant: William Moses
Case Number: 1:2020cv11479
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION to Remand filed by James Koppel. (Dunlap, Ben)
September 28, 2020 Filing 22 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Plaintiff's Assented-to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of #13 Motion for Remand ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 25, 2020 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Remand by James Koppel.(Dunlap, Ben)
September 22, 2020 Filing 20 Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by William Moses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit of William Moses)(Pyle, Jeffrey)
September 2, 2020 Filing 19 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Assented-to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to #13 MOTION to Remand Responses due by 9/22/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 2, 2020 Filing 18 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Remand by William Moses.(Pyle, Jeffrey)
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Opposition filed by James Koppel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C (Complaint))(Boylan, Paul)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 STATE COURT Record William Moses summons served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020.. (Pyle, Jeffrey)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by James Koppel. (Dunlap, Ben)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by James Koppel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dunlap, Ben)
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by James Koppel.(Dunlap, Ben)
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 Opposition re #5 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by James Koppel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Dunlap, Ben)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #5 MOTION to Set Aside Default . Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Montes, Mariliz)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion to Extend Time to Oppose Two Separate Motions by ThisPlaintiff. Oppositions to #5 MOTION to Set Aside Default and #6 Motion to Dismiss due by 9/8/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Time to Oppose Two Separate Motions by This Plaintiff (Assented-To in part) by James Koppel.(Dunlap, Ben)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support to #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William Moses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Montes, Mariliz)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #5 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by William Moses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Montes, Mariliz)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by William Moses. (Pyle, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/13/2020 to detach memorandum in support and its exhibits and re-docketing as a new docket entry (Montes, Mariliz).
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Set Aside Default by William Moses. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, #6 Affidavit of William Moses, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B)(Pyle, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/13/2020 to detach memorandum and it's exhibits and re-docketing as a new entry (Montes, Mariliz).
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Lambert on behalf of William Moses (Lambert, Michael)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email.(Burgos, Sandra)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by William Moses ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8361249 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Copies of Pleadings and Orders)(Pyle, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koppel v. Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Koppel
Represented By: Paul G. Boylan
Represented By: Ben N. Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Moses
Represented By: Jeffrey Jackson Pyle
Represented By: Michael J. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?