Amica Mutual Insurance Company v. Whirlpool Corporation
Plaintiff: Amica Mutual Insurance Company a/s/o Denis Anderson and Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv11502
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kyle W. LeClere. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kelly, Danielle)
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kyle W. LeClere Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8449086 by Whirlpool Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rooney, John)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Amica Mutual Insurance Company served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Rossini, Nicholas)
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Rossini, Nicholas)
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 2:20 PM in Remote Proceeding: Boston before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Attachments: #1 Template - Proposed Scheduling Order)This hearing shall be conducted remotely, by telephone only. Counsel of record will receive dial-in instructions at the email registered in CM/ECF. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public by way of teleconference. In order to gain access to the hearing via teleconference you must sign up at the following address: www.public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact www.media@uscourts.gov. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court.(Bono, Christine)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett R. Corson on behalf of Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Corson, Brett)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Whirlpool Corporation. (Rooney, John)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Whirlpool Corporation.(Rooney, John)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. Treat on behalf of Whirlpool Corporation (Treat, Robert)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Rooney on behalf of Whirlpool Corporation (Rooney, John)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Rossini, Nicholas)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Whirlpool Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Kelly, Danielle)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Whirlpool Corporation Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8366517 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kelly, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amica Mutual Insurance Company v. Whirlpool Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amica Mutual Insurance Company a/s/o Denis Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicholas A. Rossini
Represented By: Brett R. Corson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Kyle W. LeClere
Represented By: Robert T. Treat
Represented By: John F. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?