Project Citizenship Inc. v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Project Citizenship Inc.
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Department of Homeland Security and Kenneth Cuccinelli
Amicus Curiae: City of Boston
Case Number: 1:2020cv11545
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. In light of the current stay of this action, the Motion Hearing previously set for 10/23/20 is canceled. (Lima, Christine)
October 6, 2020 Filing 21 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered ALLOWING #20 Motion to Stay. (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 5, 2020 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Stay re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 17 Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #16 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Joint Motion to Stay All Proceedings Related to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Kenneth Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Straus Harris, Julie)
October 2, 2020 Filing 19 AMICUS BRIEF filed by City of Boston (and on Behalf of 34 Additional Cities, Counties and Municipal Agencies, and the U.S. Conference of Mayors) in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (McPherson, Nathanial)
October 1, 2020 Filing 18 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered: ALLOWING #15 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered: ALLOWING #13 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of the City of Boston, 34 Additional Cities, Counties and Municipal Agencies, and U.S. Conference of Mayors in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by City of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed amicus brief)(McPherson, Nathanial)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathanial J. McPherson on behalf of City of Boston (McPherson, Nathanial)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Leave to File / Joint Motion to Adopt Stipulated Proposed Briefing Schedule, Defendants' Request for Leave to File Additional Pages, and Plaintiff's Request for Leave to File a Reply by Project Citizenship Inc..(Roy, Amy)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Project Citizenship Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhiibts A - F)(Roy, Amy)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Project Citizenship Inc..(Roy, Amy)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of Kenneth Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf (Farquhar, Rayford)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Straus Harris on behalf of Kenneth Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf (Straus Harris, Julie)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Releif against Kenneth Cuccinelli, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf, filed by Project Citizenship Inc..(Roy, Amy)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton added. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 455(a), I hereby recuse myself from this proceeding. The Clerk is directed to return the case for reassignment.(McDonagh, Christina)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Project Citizenship Inc.. (Roy, Amy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Project Citizenship Inc.. (Roy, Amy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth Cuccinelli, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8377447 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Project Citizenship Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Roy, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Project Citizenship Inc. v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Project Citizenship Inc.
Represented By: Amy D. Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Boston
Represented By: Nathanial J. McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?