UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. and Teva Neuroscience, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11548
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 21 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered: ALLOWING #19 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 16, 2020 Filing 20 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered: DENYING #16 Motion to Transfer Case. (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 9, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Limit for Motion to Dismiss by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., Teva Neuroscience, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Renshaw, Emily)
September 17, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Transfer Case No. 20-11548 to N/A. filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Shapiro, Gregg)
September 16, 2020 Filing 17 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Alison Tanchyk. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; ALLOWING #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Erik Sitarchuk. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; ALLOWING #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Rebecca Hillyer. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; ALLOWING #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added William McEnroe. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 15, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Transfer Case No. 20-11548 to N/A. by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., Teva Neuroscience, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Renshaw, Emily)
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William McEnroe Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8418728 by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., Teva Neuroscience, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate in Support of Motion)(Renshaw, Emily)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rebecca Hillyer Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8418720 by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., Teva Neuroscience, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate in Support of Motion)(Renshaw, Emily)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Erik Sitarchuk Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8418716 by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., Teva Neuroscience, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate in Support of Motion)(Renshaw, Emily)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alison Tanchyk Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8418708 by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., Teva Neuroscience, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate in Support of Motion)(Renshaw, Emily)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., Teva Neuroscience, Inc.. (Renshaw, Emily)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. Renshaw on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., Teva Neuroscience, Inc. (Renshaw, Emily)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Teva Neuroscience, Inc. waiver sent on 8/18/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Rosenthal, Douglas) Modified on 8/28/2020 (Lima, Christine).
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. waiver sent on 8/18/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Rosenthal, Douglas)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nelson Wagner on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Wagner, Nelson)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J Rosenthal on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Rosenthal, Douglas)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Abraham R. George on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (George, Abraham)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg D. Shapiro on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Shapiro, Gregg)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 01, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 02, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 03, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 04, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 05, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 06, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 07, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 08, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 09, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit Exhibit 79, #80 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #81 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Panich, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: Rebecca J Hillyer
Represented By: William T McEnroe
Represented By: Alison Tanchyk
Represented By: Emily E. Renshaw
Represented By: Eric W. Sitarchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Neuroscience, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca J Hillyer
Represented By: William T McEnroe
Represented By: Alison Tanchyk
Represented By: Emily E. Renshaw
Represented By: Eric W. Sitarchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Nelson Wagner
Represented By: Abraham R. George
Represented By: Gregg D. Shapiro
Represented By: Evan D. Panich
Represented By: Douglas J Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?