Nazzaro v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Alice Nazzaro
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv11556
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Referring Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Answer having been filed in this personal injury case, the court orders the following pretrial schedule:Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 10/30/20; Motions for leave to Amend Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 11/30/20; Without leave of court, the parties are permitted to serve 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions and 30 document requests, to be filed within the 30 days of the initial disclosures. The court expects responses to be produced in thirty days, unless a showing of inability despite diligent effort is made. A party may not notice more than 3 deponents without leave of court on a showing of good cause. If the parties would like to participate in the court's mediation program, they must notify our docket clerk Arnold Pacho (617-748-9812) no later than 1/25/21, as it may take several weeks to schedule a mediation date.The court notes that, in this session, treating physicians are not required to produce Rule 26 reports, rather plaintiff's relevant medical records are produced as part of fact discovery by plaintiff or by plaintiff's counsel presenting to defendant completed releases for relevant records and providers by 10/30/20 as part of her automatic disclosures. The court does not require treating physicians to produce reports under Rule 26 if producing her relevant treatment records. Plaintiff is obligated to supplement these records under the procedural rules.All fact discovery must be completed by 2/22/21. Any dispositive motions are due by 3/19/21; Oppositions by 4/9/21; Reply only with leave of court. If the parties intend to engage to expert witness(es) (other than treating physicians), they must inform the court no later than 1/8/21, so that the pretrial schedule can be amended.(Zierk, Marsha)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT Record. (Bradley, Audrey)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Bradley, Audrey)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant, Speedway LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Speedway LLC.(Bradley, Audrey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Coppola, Katelyn)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Speedway LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8379229 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Bradley, Audrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nazzaro v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Audrey Lewchik Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Nazzaro
Represented By: Robert A. Costantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?