Allied Elevator Group Inc. et al v. 3Phase Elevator Corp.
Plaintiff: Ronald Tremblay and Allied Elevator Group Inc.
Defendant: 3Phase Elevator Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11557
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III & IV And For Judgment On The Pleadings On Counts I & II filed by 3Phase Elevator Corp.. (Weibust, Erik)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Counsel must now file the Reply as a separate entry on the docket. (Zierk, Marsha)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Assented To Request For Leave To File A Reply In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss Counts III And IV And Its Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings On Counts I and II by 3Phase Elevator Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Reply Memorandum Of Law In Further Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss Counts III And IV And For Judgment On The Pleadings On Counts I And II)(Weibust, Erik)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 STATE COURT Record. (Weibust, Erik)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Ronald Tremblay.(Goldberg, Russell)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III & IV And For Judgment On The Pleadings On Counts I & II filed by Ronald Tremblay. (Goldberg, Russell)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III & IV And For Judgment On The Pleadings On Counts I & II filed by Allied Elevator Group Inc.. (Goldberg, Russell)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III & IV And For Judgment On The Pleadings On Counts I & II filed by 3Phase Elevator Corp.. (Weibust, Erik)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III & IV And For Judgment On The Pleadings On Counts I & II by 3Phase Elevator Corp..(Weibust, Erik)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Allied Elevator Group Inc., Ronald Tremblay by 3Phase Elevator Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Post Closing Adjustment Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Tremblay Proof of Payment, #3 Exhibit C - IUEC CBA, #4 Exhibit D - December 4, 2019 Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - October 1, 2019 Tremblay Time, #6 Exhibit F - October 2, 2019 Tremblay Time, #7 Exhibit G - October 3, 2019 Tremblay Time)(Weibust, Erik)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email.(Burgos, Sandra)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 3Phase Elevator Corp.. (Weibust, Erik)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3Phase Elevator Corp. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8379508 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B. Collective Bargaining Agreement, #3 Exhibit C. Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Local Category Form)(Weibust, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied Elevator Group Inc. et al v. 3Phase Elevator Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3Phase Elevator Corp.
Represented By: Erik W. Weibust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Tremblay
Represented By: Russell Z. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Elevator Group Inc.
Represented By: Russell Z. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?