Credit Acceptance Corporation v. Healey
Plaintiff: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Defendant: Maura T. Healey
Case Number: 1:2020cv11572
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Maura T. Healey. (Haskell, Eric)
October 19, 2020 Filing 18 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #17 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 16, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Unopposed) by Maura T. Healey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Reply)(Haskell, Eric)
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Carroll, James)
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #13 Memorandum in Support of Motion. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of it to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Lima, Christine)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan T. Jarboe on behalf of Maura T. Healey (Jarboe, Brendan)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Maura T. Healey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of AAG Diana Hooley)(Haskell, Eric)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Maura T. Healey.(Haskell, Eric)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana K. Hooley on behalf of Maura T. Healey (Hooley, Diana)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Maura T. Healey answer due 9/25/2020. (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/25/20 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Maura T. Healey.(Haskell, Eric) Modified on 9/14/2020 to fix event type (Vieira, Leonardo).
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Haskell on behalf of Maura T. Healey (Haskell, Eric)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Maura T. Healey served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Carroll, James)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Anand S. Raman and Patrick G. Rideout. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anand S. Raman, Patrick G. Rideout Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-8385197 by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 (Certification of Anand S. Raman), #2 (Certification of Patrick G. Rideout))(Carroll, James)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Carroll, James)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maura T. Healey Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8385185 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Carroll, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Credit Acceptance Corporation v. Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Represented By: Patrick G Rideout
Represented By: Anand S Raman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maura T. Healey
Represented By: Diana K. Hooley
Represented By: Eric A. Haskell
Represented By: Brendan T. Jarboe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?