Abubardar v. Gross et al
Plaintiff: Raheem Rashed Abubardar
Defendant: Ismael Henriquez and William G. Gross
Case Number: 1:2020cv11590
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 14 Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Raheem Rashed Abubardar. (Benzaken, Jason)
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 STATE COURT Record. (Fahey, John)
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 10/23/2020. (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Ocotber 23, 2020 to File Response/Reply as to #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Raheem Rashed Abubardar.(Benzaken, Jason)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by William G. Gross, Ismael Henriquez. (Fahey, John)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by William G. Gross, Ismael Henriquez.(Fahey, John)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Service of Process filed by Raheem Rashed Abubardar. Individual(s)/Entities served: Ismael Henriquez. (Benzaken, Jason)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason G. Benzaken on behalf of Raheem Rashed Abubardar (Benzaken, Jason)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Currie, Haley)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to September 11 2020 to File Answer by William G. Gross, Ismael Henriquez.(Fahey, John)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee/payment: $400.00, receipt number 1BST081600 for #1 Notice of Removal, (Coppola, Katelyn)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by William G. Gross, Ismael Henriquez ( Fee Status: Local Government) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Superior Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet)(Fahey, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abubardar v. Gross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raheem Rashed Abubardar
Represented By: Jason G. Benzaken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ismael Henriquez
Represented By: John A. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G. Gross
Represented By: John A. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?