Indian Harbor Insurance Company v. Lynnway Auto Auction et al
Plaintiff: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Defendant: Emelly Colon-Santos, Edris M Santos, Maureen Vincent, Sandra Ortiz, Giovanni Santiago, BLR, LLC, Roger Hartwell, Fanny Ramirez, Steven Sarkis, Edgar Meza, Ruben D. Espaillat, Mark Lee, Flavio Januario, Kenneth Vincent, Shirley Meza Lopez, Lynnway Auto Auction, Bresmil Robles, Tammy L. Berio, Abdul Nasser and Lynnway Auto Auction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11687
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven T. Snow on behalf of Flavio Januario (Snow, Steven)
October 28, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Yasi on behalf of Fanny Ramirez (Yasi, John)
October 28, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Yasi on behalf of Bresmil Robles (Yasi, John)
October 27, 2020 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Giovanni Santiago waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Hensley, Candace)
October 26, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian S. Quirk on behalf of Emelly Colon-Santos (Quirk, Brian)
October 26, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian S. Quirk on behalf of Edris M Santos (Quirk, Brian)
October 26, 2020 Filing 32 Victim-Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ruben D. Espaillat.(Conley, J.)
October 26, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian S. Quirk on behalf of Edgar Meza (Quirk, Brian)
October 26, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian S. Quirk on behalf of Shirley Meza Lopez (Quirk, Brian)
October 20, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul N. Barbadoro on behalf of Tammy L. Berio (Barbadoro, Paul)
October 19, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. Molinari on behalf of Tammy L. Berio (Molinari, Susan)
October 16, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Flavio Januario waiver sent on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Hensley, Candace)
October 16, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Tammy L. Berio waiver sent on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Hensley, Candace)
October 9, 2020 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Edgar Meza served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Hensley, Candace)
October 9, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Shirley Meza Lopez served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Hensley, Candace)
October 9, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Emelly Colon-Santos served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Hensley, Candace)
October 9, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Bresmil Robles served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Hensley, Candace)
October 9, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Ruben D. Espaillat waiver sent on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Hensley, Candace)
October 8, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Michael Conley on behalf of Ruben D. Espaillat (Conley, J.)
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven P. Kfoury on behalf of Mark Lee (Kfoury, Steven)
October 8, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Mark Lee waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Hensley, Candace)
October 8, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Edris M Santos served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Hensley, Candace)
October 8, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Sandra Ortiz waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Hensley, Candace)
October 8, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Lynnway Auto Auction, Inc. waiver sent on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Hensley, Candace)
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Roger Hartwell waiver sent on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Hensley, Candace)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. BLR, LLC waiver sent on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Hensley, Candace)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Fanny Ramirez served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Hensley, Candace)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Abdul Nasser served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Hensley, Candace)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy C. Kelleher, III on behalf of Maureen Vincent (Kelleher, Timothy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy C. Kelleher, III on behalf of Kenneth Vincent (Kelleher, Timothy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey R. Poore on behalf of Maureen Vincent (Poore, Audrey)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey R. Poore on behalf of Kenneth Vincent (Poore, Audrey)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Kenneth Vincent waiver sent on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Maureen Vincent waiver sent on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Hensley, Candace)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Steven Sarkis waiver sent on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Hensley, Candace)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Candace J. Hensley on behalf of Indian Harbor Insurance Company (Hensley, Candace)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8414028 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover and Category Sheets, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Scully, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indian Harbor Insurance Company v. Lynnway Auto Auction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emelly Colon-Santos
Represented By: Brian S. Quirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edris M Santos
Represented By: Brian S. Quirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Vincent
Represented By: Timothy C. Kelleher, III
Represented By: Audrey R. Poore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giovanni Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Hartwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fanny Ramirez
Represented By: John R. Yasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Sarkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Meza
Represented By: Brian S. Quirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben D. Espaillat
Represented By: J. Michael Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Lee
Represented By: Steven P. Kfoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flavio Januario
Represented By: Steven T. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Vincent
Represented By: Timothy C. Kelleher, III
Represented By: Audrey R. Poore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Meza Lopez
Represented By: Brian S. Quirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynnway Auto Auction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bresmil Robles
Represented By: John R. Yasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy L. Berio
Represented By: Paul N. Barbadoro
Represented By: Susan M. Molinari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdul Nasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynnway Auto Auction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph K. Scully
Represented By: Candace J. Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?