Clinton-Brown et al v. Hardick et al
Plaintiff: Ebony Clinton-Brown and Todd Brown
Defendant: Helene Hardick, John Hardick and Trustees of the Helene Hardick Living Trust
Case Number: 1:2020cv11694
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Simons, Michael)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/23/2020 03:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani. Teleconference # 888-808-6929 access code: 8523158. (MacDonald, Gail)
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added William M. Dolan III. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kelly, Danielle)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William M. Dolan III Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8478304 by Helene Hardick, John Hardick, Trustees of the Helene Hardick Living Trust. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Procaccini, Daniel)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. D'Ippolito, III on behalf of Helene Hardick, John Hardick, Trustees of the Helene Hardick Living Trust (D'Ippolito, Michael)
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Procaccini on behalf of Helene Hardick, John Hardick, Trustees of the Helene Hardick Living Trust (Procaccini, Daniel)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ebony Clinton-Brown, Todd Brown. Trustees of the Helene Hardick Living Trust waiver sent on 9/17/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Simons, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ebony Clinton-Brown, Todd Brown. Helene Hardick waiver sent on 9/17/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Simons, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ebony Clinton-Brown, Todd Brown. John Hardick waiver sent on 9/17/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Simons, Michael)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8417273 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid),, filed by Ebony Clinton-Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A)(Warnock, Douglas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/16/2020) (Warnock, Douglas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clinton-Brown et al v. Hardick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helene Hardick
Represented By: Daniel J. Procaccini
Represented By: William M. Dolan, III
Represented By: Michael A. D'Ippolito, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hardick
Represented By: Daniel J. Procaccini
Represented By: William M. Dolan, III
Represented By: Michael A. D'Ippolito, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the Helene Hardick Living Trust
Represented By: Daniel J. Procaccini
Represented By: William M. Dolan, III
Represented By: Michael A. D'Ippolito, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony Clinton-Brown
Represented By: John Michael Dupuis
Represented By: Michael D. Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Brown
Represented By: Michael D. Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?