G & J Fisheries, Inc.
Plaintiff: G & J Fisheries, Inc.
Claimant: BHF Blue Eastern, LLC and Peter Amaral
Case Number: 1:2020cv11703
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 15 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Entry of Default (Montes, Mariliz)
November 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Entry of Default by G & J Fisheries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Counsel)(Aprans, Olaf)
November 4, 2020 Filing 13 Claim and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BHF Blue Eastern, LLC.(Blatchley, Samuel)
November 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel P. Blatchley on behalf of BHF Blue Eastern, LLC (Blatchley, Samuel)
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference has been set for 12/8/2020 02:15 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 scheduling order sample, #2 standing order on summary judgment)This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov(Simeone, Maria)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Marnix E. Weber on behalf of Peter Amaral (Weber, Marnix)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 CLAIM by Peter Amaral. (Flynn, Michael)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint for Exoneration from and/or Limitation of Liability by Peter Amaral.(Flynn, Michael)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION re #1 Petition for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability, Appraisal of Michael Collyer by G & J Fisheries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Valuation Survey, #2 Redacted Settlement Sheet, #3 Collyer CV)(Aprans, Olaf)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8419508 Fee status: Filing Fee paid), filed by G & J Fisheries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Action Category Sheet)(Aprans, Olaf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G & J Fisheries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G & J Fisheries, Inc.
Represented By: Olaf Aprans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: BHF Blue Eastern, LLC
Represented By: Samuel P. Blatchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Peter Amaral
Represented By: Marnix E. Weber
Represented By: Michael B. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?