Sverdlov v. Eydinov et al
Plaintiff: Aleksander Sverdlov
Defendant: John Does 1 Through 5, Boris Eydinov, Lynn ADHC LLC, East Point ADHC LLC, Alexander Zelyony, Alexander Eydinov and Eduardo Valdez
Case Number: 1:2020cv11744
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand with Certificate of Service by Boris Eydinov.(Conti, David)
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by East Point ADHC LLC, Alexander Eydinov, Lynn ADHC LLC, Eduardo Valdez, Alexander Zelyony. (Bocchino, Amato)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by East Point ADHC LLC, Alexander Eydinov, Lynn ADHC LLC, Eduardo Valdez, Alexander Zelyony.(Bocchino, Amato)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 11/16/2020 (Urso, Lisa)
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Complaint by East Point ADHC LLC, Alexander Eydinov, Lynn ADHC LLC, Eduardo Valdez, Alexander Zelyony.(Bocchino, Amato)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amato J. Bocchino on behalf of East Point ADHC LLC, Alexander Eydinov, Lynn ADHC LLC, Eduardo Valdez, Alexander Zelyony (Bocchino, Amato)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Boris Eydinov answer due 11/16/2020. (Urso, Lisa)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 16, 2020 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with certificate of service by Boris Eydinov.(Conti, David)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Conti on behalf of Boris Eydinov (Conti, David)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Does 1 Through 5, East Point ADHC LLC, Alexander Eydinov, Boris Eydinov, Lynn ADHC LLC, Eduardo Valdez, Alexander Zelyony. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Danieli, Chris)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8431782 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Aleksander Sverdlov. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 JS45, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Badway, Ernest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sverdlov v. Eydinov et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleksander Sverdlov
Represented By: Ernest E. Badway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 Through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boris Eydinov
Represented By: David A. Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn ADHC LLC
Represented By: Amato J. Bocchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Point ADHC LLC
Represented By: Amato J. Bocchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Zelyony
Represented By: Amato J. Bocchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Eydinov
Represented By: Amato J. Bocchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Valdez
Represented By: Amato J. Bocchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?