Lyons et al v. JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., et al
Plaintiff: James Edward Lyons, Jr., Blythe Lyons and James Edward Lyons, Sr.
Defendant: Nationwide Credit, Inc. and JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,
Case Number: 1:2020cv11760
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Referring Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 20 Considering that matter has been reassigned, ELECTRONIC NOTICE Cancelling 11/2/2020 Status Conference before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
October 30, 2020 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2021 at 2:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 19, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., re #17 State Court Record (Wang, Mian)
October 19, 2020 Filing 17 STATE COURT Record. (Wang, Mian)
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Brian D. Roth. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian D. Roth Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8461866 by Nationwide Credit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian D. Roth, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(O'Connor, John)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Wang, Mian)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,. (Wang, Mian)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,.(Wang, Mian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina T.E. Staffiere on behalf of Nationwide Credit, Inc. (Staffiere, Christina)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nationwide Credit, Inc.. (O'Connor, John)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Nationwide Credit, Inc..(O'Connor, John)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. NOTICE of Status Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Thomas on behalf of JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., (Thomas, David)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,. (Wang, Mian)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mian R. Wang on behalf of JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., (Wang, Mian)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8437002 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to NOR, #3 Exhibit C to NOR, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form)(Wang, Mian) (Modified on 10/7/2020 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyons et al v. JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Credit, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Roth
Represented By: John J. O'Connor
Represented By: Christina T.E. Staffiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,
Represented By: Mian R. Wang
Represented By: David G. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Lyons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blythe Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Lyons, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?