Myeress v. PRX Inc.
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Defendant: PRX Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11769
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Joe Myeress (Bouchard, Tammy)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed PRX Inc. served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Bouchard, Tammy)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Joe Myeress. (Bouchard, Tammy)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Bouchard, Tammy)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Report on Filing or Determination re: Copyright - AO 121. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Report on the filing/termination of copyright case (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: : Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PRX Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8437879 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Joe Myeress. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bouchard, Tammy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myeress v. PRX Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRX Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Represented By: Tammy Fern Bouchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?