Frank v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Debroah Ann Frank
Defendant: SECANT MEDICAL, LLC, Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Johnson & Johnson, PRODESCO, INC., Gynecare, SECANT MEDICAL, INC. and Ethicon Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11771
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling 10/26/2020, in light of Stipulation of Dismissal #16 ; case shall be closed.(Bono, Christine)
October 22, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Campbell on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Campbell, James)
October 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Guilfoyle on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 10/26/2020 at 3:40 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. This hearing shall be conducted remotely, by telephone only. Counsel of record will receive dial-in instructions at the email registered in CM/ECF. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public by way of teleconference. In order to gain access to the hearing via teleconference you must sign up at the following address: #https://https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact www.media@uscourts.gov. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court.(Bono, Christine)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-03437.
August 26, 2020 PLEADING #7,9 MAILED TO UNREP (JL )
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (afm, )
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AND THE ACTION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE DISTRICT OF MASSACHUSETTS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THE RECORD TO THAT DISTRICT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/20/20. 8/20/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(JL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Debroah Ann Frank. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SASSAMAN, SHAWN)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS ON OR BEFORE 8/18/20; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/5/20. 8/6/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREP.(JL )
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Debroah Ann Frank.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SASSAMAN, SHAWN)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to BAAA filed by Prodesco, Inc., Secant Medical, Inc., Secant Medical, LLC.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 - August 2014 Order, #4 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Karen West)(CALLSEN, JULIE)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service of State Court Complaint by Debroah Ann Frank re: Bucks County Sheriff served Summons and Complaint upon Prodesco, Inc., Secant Medical, Inc., Secant Medical, LLC by Personal Service. (SASSAMAN, SHAWN) Modified on 7/28/2020 (fb).
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(CALLSEN, JULIE)
July 14, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Debroah Ann Frank. (fb)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with ECF by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.(CALLSEN, JULIE)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14418880), filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Track Form)(CALLSEN, JULIE) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/14/2020) (fb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECANT MEDICAL, LLC
Represented By: JULIE A. CALLSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Women's Health and Urology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: JULIE A. CALLSEN
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Kathleen M. Guilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRODESCO, INC.
Represented By: JULIE A. CALLSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gynecare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECANT MEDICAL, INC.
Represented By: JULIE A. CALLSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc.
Represented By: JULIE A. CALLSEN
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Kathleen M. Guilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debroah Ann Frank
Represented By: SHAWN M. SASSAMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?