Pena Rodriguez v. Moniz
Petitioner: Reimon Pena Rodriguez
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Not Classified By Court: Sheriff Joseph D. McDonald, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11786
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 14 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered. (Baker, Casey)
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus (Dkt. #1 ) is DENIED. SO ORDERED.(Baker, Casey)
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Reimon Pena Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Immigration Court Bond Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B DHS Bond Submission, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Petitioner Bond Submission, #4 Exhibit Transcript of Bond Hearing)(Masferrer, Eduardo)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE/ANSWER to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), by Joseph D. McDonald, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 IJ Order, #3 Exhibit 3 Bond Hrg Transcript)(Kanwit, Thomas)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Antone Moniz response due 10/14/2020. (Baker, Casey)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 Opposition re #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to October 14, 2020 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Petition filed by Reimon Pena Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Email Correspondence), #2 Exhibit 2 (Email Correspondence), #3 Exhibit 3 (Email Correspondence), #4 Exhibit 4 (Transcript))(Masferrer, Eduardo)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to October 14, 2020 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Petition by Antone Moniz.(Kanwit, Thomas)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kanwit on behalf of Antone Moniz (Kanwit, Thomas)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. The Clerk shall serve the petition on the Respondent and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. Within 7 days of the entry of this Order, Respondent shall file a brief with supporting documentation, including the Order of the Immigration Judge with Respect to Custody, and if possible the transcript of the bond hearing. Petitioner shall file a reply brief with supporting documentation within 7 days of the filing of Respondent's brief.(PSSA, 3)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Burgos, Sandra)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eduardo A. Masferrer on behalf of Reimon Pena Rodriguez (Masferrer, Eduardo)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8440818 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Reimon Pena Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Masferrer, Eduardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pena Rodriguez v. Moniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reimon Pena Rodriguez
Represented By: Eduardo A. Masferrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Sheriff Joseph D. McDonald, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?