Hernandez v. Kenneway et al
Petitioner: Jose Hernandez
Respondent: Steven Kenneway and Maura Healy
Case Number: 1:2020cv11794
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Motion for the Appointment of Counsel. Appointed David H. Mirsky, nunc pro tunc 9/30/2020. (Beatty, Barbara)
November 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jose Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Mirsky, David)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #6 Assented to Motion for an Enlargement of Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Plead until January 7, 2021. (Beatty, Barbara)
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 7, 2021 to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), by Steven Kenneway.(Lumelsky, Anna)
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Steven Kenneway -- Statement Regarding Existence of Victim (Lumelsky, Anna)
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna E. Lumelsky on behalf of Steven Kenneway (Lumelsky, Anna)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 21 days of receipt of this order. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8442831 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Jose Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Superior Court Memorandum and Order on Motion for New Trial, #2 Exhibit Supreme Judicial Court Published Decision, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet and Category Form)(Mirsky, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Kenneway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Kenneway
Represented By: Anna E. Lumelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Maura Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Hernandez
Represented By: David H. Mirsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?