Nezali v. Moniz
Plaintiff: Nassim Nezali
Defendant: Antone Moniz, Mr. Todd Lyons and Joseph D. McDonald, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11795
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE by Antone Moniz regarding Petitioner's removal (Farquhar, Rayford)
November 9, 2020 Filing 39 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2020 @ 10:00am before Judge Saris is CANCELED. (Baker, Casey)
November 9, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION re 37 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice by Nassim Nezali. (Holper, Mary)
November 7, 2020 Filing 37 *** DISREGARD - Duplicate Filing. (Baker, Casey)
November 6, 2020 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #5 Emergency MOTION Interim Relief pursuant to Mapp v. Reno : This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2020 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Baker, Casey)
November 4, 2020 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2020 CANCELED until further notice. (Baker, Casey)
November 4, 2020 Filing 34 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #33 Motion to Continue. (Baker, Casey)
November 4, 2020 Filing 33 Assented to MOTION to Continue hearing by Antone Moniz.(Farquhar, Rayford)
November 4, 2020 Filing 32 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #5 Emergency MOTION Interim Relief pursuant to Mapp v. Reno (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Holper, Mary)
November 3, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to #5 Emergency MOTION Interim Relief pursuant to Mapp v. Reno Leave Granted 11/3/2020 filed by Nassim Nezali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Holper, Mary)
November 3, 2020 Filing 30 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #29 MOTION to permit reply to opposition ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Baker, Casey)
November 2, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION permit reply to opposition re #25 Opposition to Motion by Nassim Nezali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Holper, Mary)
October 30, 2020 Filing 28 EXHIBIT re #25 Opposition to Motion by Antone Moniz. (Farquhar, Rayford)
October 29, 2020 Filing 27 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued for 11/5/2020. (Baker, Casey)
October 29, 2020 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #5 Emergency MOTION Interim Relief pursuant to Mapp v. Reno : This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2020 11:15 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Baker, Casey)
October 29, 2020 Filing 25 Opposition re #5 Emergency MOTION Interim Relief pursuant to Mapp v. Reno filed by Antone Moniz. (Farquhar, Rayford)
October 28, 2020 Filing 24 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. "Defendants shall file an affidavit after ICE's October 30, 2020 meeting at the Algerian Embassy to update the Court on the status of removal to Algeria on or before 11/4/2020." (Baker, Casey)
October 27, 2020 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief may be granted filed by Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Farquhar, Rayford)
October 27, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief may be granted by Antone Moniz.(Farquhar, Rayford)
October 27, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Eve A. Piemonte (Piemonte, Eve)
October 27, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of Antone Moniz (Farquhar, Rayford)
October 26, 2020 Filing 19 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. AUSA shall file a Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney and a Notice of Appearance shall be filed on of before 10/29/2020.(Baker, Casey)
October 23, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Hearing on Emergency Motion scheduled for 10/26/2020 is CANCELLED due to Plymouth County Correctional Facility being unable to accommodate this date and time. (This hearing will be rescheduled as soon as possible.) (Baker, Casey)
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #5 Emergency MOTION Interim Relief pursuant to Mapp v. Reno (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Holper, Mary)
October 22, 2020 Filing 16 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued for 10/26/2020. (Baker, Casey)
October 22, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #5 Emergency MOTION Interim Relief pursuant to Mapp v. Reno (Holper, Mary)
October 21, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #5 Emergency MOTION Interim Relief pursuant to Mapp v. Reno (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Holper, Mary)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion re #5 Emergency MOTION Interim Relief pursuant to Mapp v. Reno . This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2020 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Baker, Casey)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting re #9 Assented to MOTION Student Appearance of Danna Khabbaz and granting #10 Assented to MOTION Student Appearance of Anh Duy Nguyen filed by Nassim Nezali. (Baker, Casey)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion to Seal. Counsel will receive an email within twenty-four (24) hours of this order with instructions for submitting sealed documents for which leave has been granted in accordance with the Local Rules of the U.S. District Court of Massachusetts. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Baker, Casey)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION Student Appearance Anh Duy Nguyen by Nassim Nezali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Holper, Mary)
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION Student Appearance Danna Khabbaz by Nassim Nezali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Holper, Mary)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit - Medical Records filed by Nassim Nezali. (Holper, Mary)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit - Medical Records by Nassim Nezali.(Holper, Mary)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 Emergency MOTION Interim Relief pursuant to Mapp v. Reno filed by Nassim Nezali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Holper, Mary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2020: #4 Exhibit 4 - SEALED) (Baker, Casey).
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION Interim Relief pursuant to Mapp v. Reno by Nassim Nezali.(Holper, Mary)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eve A. Piemonte on behalf of Antone Moniz (Piemonte, Eve)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Order entered pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 governing Section 2241 cases for service on respondents. (PSSA, 5)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8443392 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Nassim Nezali. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Holper, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nezali v. Moniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nassim Nezali
Represented By: Mary P. Holper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antone Moniz
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Eve A. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Todd Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph D. McDonald, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?