Houle v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Marc Houle
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2020cv11801
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 11:00 AM before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.This hearing shall take place remotely, by telephone only.Please use the following dial-in information:DIAL IN: (888) 675-2535ACCESS CODE: 7629998REMINDER: Counsel and participants who are not addressing the Court, please mute your telephones, so that you may hear the proceeding but other participants will not hear background noise or interference. Please do not put your telephone on speaker or hold.Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-13111-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Richard B. North with Certificate of Service (North, Richard)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Gail Roma on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Roma, Jennifer)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Brown on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Brown, Matthew)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-01705.
September 18, 2020 Remark: Transferring Case to the District of Massachusetts via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER (FOURTH). That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Clerk of this District is directed to transfer the cases listed on Schedule A to appropriate districts for further proceedings. See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/10/20. (MAP)
June 2, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-1705-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 2, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14287815 filed by Marc Houle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houle v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Roma
Represented By: Matthew E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Roma
Represented By: Matthew E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Houle
Represented By: Barry JD Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?