Valtierra v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Plaintiff: Maria Valtierra
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv11815
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Coppola, Katelyn)
November 23, 2020 Filing 19 Transcript of Status Conference held on November 16, 2020, before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com. Redaction Request due 12/14/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2021. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Coppola, Katelyn)
November 16, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE re: Status Conference set for 12/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding: Boston before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. Counsel of record: To gain access to the hearing, please register at the following address: https://https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. (Counsel shall select "Public" as 'Sign-up Type'. Counsel shall enter Display Name and telephone number, for video access.)This hearing will be conducted by video conference. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
November 16, 2020 Filing 17 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 11/16/2020.1) The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings.2) The Court heard updates on discovery regarding supplemental disclosures from Novartis. 3) A colloquy was held regarding 2027 Notice by GSK of FDA's Rejection of Proposed Labeling Changes. The Court ordered supplemental briefing on the effect of this development on GSK's outstanding federal preemption motion and any other outstanding motions. The Court ordered the briefs to be submitted by Thursday, December 3, 2020, with any response due by Thursday, December 10, 2020. The Court set a hearing on the matter for the next status conference on December 16, 2020.4) The parties informed the Court that Dr. Abdulla's deposition was rescheduled for Thursday, November 19, 2020 at 10:00 am EST. 5) A colloquy was held on #19 GSK's Motion for Order to Show Cause and 32 Plaintiffs' Counsel's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in Nelson, 20-cv-11210. The Court took the matter under advisement.6) The Court set a status conference for December 16, 2020 at 11:00 am. The conference shall be conducted by video conference. The clerk shall post video conference information on the docket via a separate entry. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
November 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Coppola, Katelyn)
November 3, 2020 Filing 15 Transcript of Status Conference via Zoom Conference held on November 3, 2020, before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com. Redaction Request due 11/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/4/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2021. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Coppola, Katelyn)
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE re: Hearing on Motion 2015 Emergency MOTION related to the Deposition of Dr. Ra-Id Abdulla: Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding: Boston before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Counsel of record: To gain access to the hearing, please register at the following address: https://https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. (Counsel shall select "Public" as 'Sign-up Type'. Counsel shall enter Display Name and telephone number, for video access.)This hearing will be conducted by video conference. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
October 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Coppola, Katelyn)
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 Transcript of Status Conference by Zoom held on October 26, 2020, before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com. Redaction Request due 11/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2021. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Coppola, Katelyn)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Status Conference set for 11/16/2020 at 11:00 AM, in Remote Proceeding: Boston before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.Counsel of record: To gain access to the hearing, please register at the following address: https://https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. (Counsel shall select "Public" as 'Sign-up Type'. Counsel shall enter Display Name and telephone number, for video access.)This hearing will be conducted by video conference. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 10/26/2020.1) The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings.2) The Court heard updates on discovery regarding supplemental disclosures from Novartis.3) A colloquy was held regarding 2009 Notice by GSK of Significant New Expert Developments and 2010 Response by Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel to GSK's Notice on Dr. Louik's supplemental deposition and its effect on the pending Daubert motion, 1251 GSK's Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's General Causation Experts Under Federal Rule of Evidence 702.4) The Court put the question of a trial date in the Rodriguez case on pause due to the difficulties posed by the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic. 5) A colloquy was held on 35 GSK's Motion for Order to Show Cause and 32 Plaintiffs Counsels Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in Ratliff, 20-cv-10047. The Court took the matter under advisement.6) The Court set a status conference for November 16, 2020, at 11:00 am. The conference shall be conducted by video conference. The clerk shall post video conference information on the docket via a separate entry. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Coppola, Katelyn)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 Transcript of Status Conference held on October 7, 2020, before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com. Redaction Request due 11/4/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2021. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Coppola, Katelyn)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 Transcript of Status Conference held on October 5, 2020, before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com. Redaction Request due 11/4/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2021. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Coppola, Katelyn)
October 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Stevenson on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline LLC (Stevenson, Jennifer)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE re: Hearing on Motion 2000 Emergency MOTION to Compel Production of Dr. Sadler's File and Request for Teleconference : Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2020 at 2:30 PM in Remote Proceeding: Boston before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. Counsel of record: To gain access to the hearing, please register at the following address: #https://https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. (Counsel shall select "Public" as 'Sign-up Type'. Counsel shall enter Display Name and telephone number, for video access.)This hearing will be conducted by video conference. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GlaxoSmithKline LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; Valtierra v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. In Re: Zofran (Ondansetron) Products Liability Litigation, MDL 2657. (Finn, Mary)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8449541 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Maria Valtierra.(Desmond, Adriana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valtierra v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Valtierra
Represented By: Adriana Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Jennifer M. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?