Young v. Healey
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Maura Healey
Case Number: 1:2020cv11832
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Memorandum & ORDER, by Huguette Nicole Young. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 Copy re #11 Order on Motion for Reconsideration mailed to Huguette Nicole Young on 11/2/20. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying #10 Motion for Reconsideration. (Zierk, Marsha)
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Memorandum & ORDER, by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3)(Maynard, Timothy)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Maura Healey, filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Maynard, Timothy)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 Copy re #7 Order Dismissing Case, #6 Memorandum & Order, and docket sheet mailed to Huguette Nicole Young on 10/9/2020. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Order of Dismissal. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER1.This action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction.2. In view of the dismissal of this action for lack of subject jurisdiction, no action will be taken on plaintiff's pending motions (Docket Nos. 2-4).(PSSA, 4)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (adminn, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by Huguette Nicole Young.(Warnock, Douglas)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for a Speedy Hearing Under Rule 57 by Huguette Nicole Young.(Warnock, Douglas)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Warnock, Douglas)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Summons)(Warnock, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maura Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?