One World, LLC et al v. Manolakos et al
Plaintiff: One World, LLC and Gabriel Chaleplis
Defendant: Raymond C. Green Funding, LLC, Ioannis Manolakos, 9 Huntington Street LLC and Realty Capital, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv11837
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 34 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Raymond C. Green Funding, LLC, Realty Capital, LLC. (Loeb, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2020 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal by 9 Huntington Street LLC. (Brazilian, John)
November 12, 2020 Filing 32 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 24, 2020 by Ioannis Manolakos.(Brazilian, John)
November 10, 2020 Filing 31 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ENDORSED ORDER entered. re #29 Stipulation filed by Gabriel Chaleplis, One World, LLC. NOTED (RWZ) (Urso, Lisa)
November 10, 2020 Filing 30 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Raymond C. Green Funding, LLC answer due 11/20/2020; Realty Capital, LLC answer due 11/20/2020. (Urso, Lisa)
November 5, 2020 Filing 29 STIPULATION to Release of Lis Pendens Without Prejudice by Gabriel Chaleplis, One World, LLC. (Kasolas, Bob)
October 29, 2020 Filing 28 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 20, 2020 to File Answer by Raymond C. Green Funding, LLC, Realty Capital, LLC.(Loeb, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2020 Filing 27 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Telephone Conference held on 10/29/2020, Status Report due by 11/10/2020 re: surety arrangement; if unsuccessful Judge will decide; include a joint proposal of how the parties would like to proceed), (Dispositive Motions (Lenders) due by 11/20/2020; opposition 12/11/2020; Judge to decide on the papers; (Court Reporter: None.)(Attorneys present: various) (Urso, Lisa)
October 28, 2020 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #17 MOTION Dissolution of Memorandum of Lis Pendens filed by Gabriel Chaleplis, One World, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Kelly, Jessica)
October 28, 2020 Filing 25 Opposition re #17 MOTION Dissolution of Memorandum of Lis Pendens filed by Gabriel Chaleplis, One World, LLC. (Kelly, Jessica)
October 28, 2020 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 10/29/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. call in #888-675-2535 access code 7065717(Urso, Lisa)
October 26, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey B. Loeb on behalf of Raymond C. Green Funding, LLC (Loeb, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey B. Loeb on behalf of Realty Capital, LLC (Loeb, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Alec S. Pine on behalf of 9 Huntington Street LLC, Ioannis Manolakos (Pine, Alec)
October 26, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #17 MOTION Dissolution of Memorandum of Lis Pendens filed by 9 Huntington Street LLC, Ioannis Manolakos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Brazilian, John)
October 26, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #17 MOTION Dissolution of Memorandum of Lis Pendens filed by 9 Huntington Street LLC, Ioannis Manolakos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Brazilian, John)
October 26, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION Dissolution of Memorandum of Lis Pendens filed by 9 Huntington Street LLC, Ioannis Manolakos. (Brazilian, John)
October 26, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION Dissolution of Memorandum of Lis Pendens by 9 Huntington Street LLC, Ioannis Manolakos.(Brazilian, John)
October 26, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Brazilian on behalf of 9 Huntington Street LLC, Ioannis Manolakos (Brazilian, John)
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed 9 Huntington Street LLC served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Kelly, Jessica)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Realty Capital, LLC served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Kelly, Jessica)
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Raymond C. Green Funding, LLC served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Kelly, Jessica)
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ioannis Manolakos served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Kelly, Jessica)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Lis Pendens (Urso, Lisa)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. Lis Pendens by Gabriel Chaleplis, One World, LLC(Urso, Lisa)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Bob Kasolas. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Currie, Haley)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (adminn, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by One World, LLC. (Kelly, Jessica)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Bob Kasolas in Support re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Bob Kasolas Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8457513 filed by Gabriel Chaleplis, One World, LLC. (Kelly, Jessica)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Bob Kasolas Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8457513 by Gabriel Chaleplis, One World, LLC.(Kelly, Jessica)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Lis Pendens filed by Gabriel Chaleplis, One World, LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Memorandum of Lis Pendens)(Kelly, Jessica)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Lis Pendens by Gabriel Chaleplis, One World, LLC.(Kelly, Jessica)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8457416 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Gabriel Chaleplis, One World, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I)(Kelly, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: One World, LLC et al v. Manolakos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: One World, LLC
Represented By: Bob Kasolas
Represented By: Jessica Gray Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Chaleplis
Represented By: Bob Kasolas
Represented By: Jessica Gray Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond C. Green Funding, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Loeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ioannis Manolakos
Represented By: John H. Brazilian
Represented By: Alec S. Pine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9 Huntington Street LLC
Represented By: John H. Brazilian
Represented By: Alec S. Pine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realty Capital, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Loeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?