Lansky v. Howmedica Osteonics Corporation
Plaintiff: Olivia Lansky
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv11878
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Master Long Form Complaint by Howmedica Osteonics Corporation. (Kelly, Danielle)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 MASTER LONG FORM COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corporation. (Kelly, Danielle)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Indira Talwani: MDL ORDERS 1-13 entered, (Attachments: #1 Case Management Orders 1-7, #2 Order Extending Discovery, #3 Fact Sheet Implementation Order, #4 Plaintiff Fact Sheet, #5 Defendant Fact Sheet, #6 Protective Order, #7 ESI Order, #8 Order Aiding Private Settlement)(Jones, Sherry) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/19/2020) (Kelly, Danielle).
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number: 59, MDL No. 2768 has been transferred from Northern District of Illinois and assigned civil action number: 20-11878. Northern District of Illinois case number: 20-5196. In Re: Striker Orthopaedics LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation (Jones, Sherry)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (Jones, Sherry)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-05196.
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSFERRED to the USDC of Massachusetts the electronic record. (bg, )
October 19, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2768 Conditional Transfer Order filed 10/19/2020 (bg, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to USDC of Massachusetts. (bg, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Olivia Lansky regarding Complaint & Summoms served on Howmedica Osteonics Corp on 09/30/2020 (Nevitt, Ervin)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Olivia Lansky by Ervin Bryce Nevitt (Nevitt, Ervin)
September 4, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Howmedica Osteonics Corporation (exr, )
September 2, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Olivia Lansky; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17389728. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nevitt, Ervin)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (smm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lansky v. Howmedica Osteonics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Lansky
Represented By: Ervin Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?