Jelen v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Sean Jelen
Defendant: Fenisha Williams and Law Offices of Donald Mastrodomenico, P.C
Case Number: 1:2020cv11910
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, within 21 days of the date of this Order, he must file a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by his certified prison account statement. The Clerk shall mail copies of this Order to Plaintiff at the address in Pennsylvania and to Sean Jelen (#75353067), FMC Devens, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. Box 879, Ayer, MA 01432. (PSSA, 4)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sean Jelen. (Kelly, Danielle) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/14/2020) (Kelly, Danielle).
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. If Plaintiff elects to proceed with this action, within 21 days of the date of this Order, he must file a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by his certified prison account statement. The Clerk shall provide plaintiff with an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and a copy of the October 28, 2020 Memorandum and Order. No summonses shall issue pending resolution of the filing fee and screening of the complaint. (PSSA, 4)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 Letter/request (non-motion) from Sean Jelen. (Kelly, Danielle)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 Judge Indira Talwani: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. 1.The Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis [#2] is denied without prejudice. If plaintiff elects to proceed with this action, within 35 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, he must file a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by his certified prison account statement. 2.No summonses shall issue pending resolution of the filing fee and screening of the complaint. As set forth above, the pleadings as filed are subject to dismissal upon such screening. (PSSA, 4)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Danieli, Chris)
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sean Jelen.(Castilla, Francis)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT/ Emergency Rule 65, F.R.C.P. against All Defendants, filed by Sean Jelen. (Attachments: #1 cover sheet, #2 envelope)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jelen v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Jelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fenisha Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Donald Mastrodomenico, P.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?