U.S. Bank National Association v. Mayflower Emerald Square, LLC
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Mayflower Emerald Square, LLC
Receiver: Gregory T. Maloney
Case Number: 1:2020cv11946
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT November 2020 Management Report by Gregory T. Maloney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hogan, L.)
November 18, 2020 Filing 15 Judge Patti B. Saris: AMENDED ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER entered. (Baker, Casey)
November 17, 2020 Filing 14 Proposed Document(s) submitted by U.S. Bank National Association. Document received: [Proposed] Amended Order Appointing Receiver. (Batastini, Armando)
November 17, 2020 Filing 13 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion to Amend. "Allowed. Parties shall submit a Proposed Amended Order Appointing Receiver by 11/20/2020." (Baker, Casey)
November 17, 2020 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION to Amend #10 Order (Assented to Joint Motion to Amend Receivership Order) by U.S. Bank National Association.(Batastini, Armando)
November 6, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Mayflower Emerald Square, LLC served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Batastini, Armando)
November 5, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER entered. (Baker, Casey)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by L. Alexandra Hogan on behalf of Gregory T. Maloney (Hogan, L.)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward V. Sabella on behalf of Gregory T. Maloney (Sabella, Edward)
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Gregory T. Maloney appointed. (Baker, Casey)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 Assented to MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Batastini, Armando)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION to Appoint Receiver by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Proposed Order)(Batastini, Armando)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp. for U.S. Bank National Association.. (Batastini, Armando)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mayflower Emerald Square, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Baker, Casey)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against Mayflower Emerald Square, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8486359 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of COMM 2012-CCRE3 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Document, #2 Exhibit B-1, Document, #3 Exhibit B-2, Document, #4 Exhibit C, Document, #5 Exhibit D-1, Document, #6 Exhibit D-2, Document, #7 Exhibit E, Document, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Category Sheet, #10 Summons)(Batastini, Armando)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Mayflower Emerald Square, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Armando E Batastini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayflower Emerald Square, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Gregory T. Maloney
Represented By: L. Alexandra Hogan
Represented By: Edward V. Sabella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?