Hill v. Ahmed et al
Plaintiff: Jaquan Hill
Defendant: Unknown Well Path Employees, Nurse Geeto, Unknown Officers, Sgt Faturdo, Doctor Ahmed and Nurse Practioner Jen
Case Number: 1:2020cv11959
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Please see attached. (Kelly, Danielle)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Plaintiff has failed to file a renewed Application by the deadline, and accordingly, this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). The clerk shall enter a separate order of dismissal. Please see attached. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 Judge Indira Talwani: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered. If plaintiff elects to proceed with this action, within 21 days of the date of this Procedural Order, he must file a renewed Application. Failure to timely comply with this Procedural Order will subject this case to dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk shall provide plaintiff with an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs.(PSSA, 4)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jaquan Hill. (Kelly, Danielle)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (Castilla, Francis)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jaquan Hill.(Castilla, Francis)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jaquan Hill.(Castilla, Francis)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jaquan Hill. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G -end)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Ahmed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Well Path Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Geeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Faturdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Practioner Jen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaquan Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?