Kikweta v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Gloire Kikweta
Respondent: Matthew Albence, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, William Barr, Todd Lyons and Antone Moniz
Case Number: 1:2020cv12074
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/22/2021. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Stewart Decl., #2 Exhibit 2: Nov. 16, 2020 1st Cir. Order Denying Stay, #3 Exhibit 3: Notice of Failure to Comply)(Brizius, Erin)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 12/21/2020) by Antone Moniz.(Brizius, Erin)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Brizius on behalf of Antone Moniz (Brizius, Erin)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. 1.Antone Moniz, Superintendent of the Plymouth County Correctional Facility, shall be the sole respondent. See Rumsfeld v. Padilla, 542 U.S. 426, 439 (2004) (immediate custodian of petitioner is proper respondent in habeas action); Vasquez v. Reno, 233 F.3d 688, 696 (1st Cir. 2000) (same, as applied to immigration detainee). The other respondents are DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. 2.The Clerk shall serve the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 [#1] on the Respondent and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. 3.The Respondent shall file a response to the petition within fourteen 14 days of the entry of this Order.(PSSA, 4)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Baker, Casey)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8522020 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Gloire Kikweta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet page one, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Page 2)(Keefe, Joanna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/23/2020: #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4) (Kelly, Danielle). (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/23/2020) (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kikweta v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloire Kikweta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Todd Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?