Snell v. Descoteaux et al
Plaintiff: Emory G. Snell, Jr.
Defendant: Michael Rodrigues, NP Michele LaFountain, MD Maria L. Angeles, James M O'gara, Kelly Hasting, NP Carlos Flores, MD Steven Descoteaux, Carol Mici, James M. O'Gara and Kelly Hastings
Case Number: 1:2020cv12093
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 EXHIBIT - Medical Report re #1 Complaint by Emory G. Snell, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 Letter/request (non-motion) from Emory G. Snell, Jr.. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Emory G. Snell, Jr. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT or Declaration of Emory G. Snell, Jr. in Support re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Emory G. Snell, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Vieira, Leonardo)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 Supplemental DECLARATION re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emory G. Snell, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(Vieira, Leonardo) Modified on 12/4/2020 to fix docket text (Vieira, Leonardo).
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and request for Counsel by Emory G. Snell, Jr.(Castilla, Francis)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Emory G. Snell, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration Support TRO)(Castilla, Francis)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Emory G. Snell, Jr. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snell v. Descoteaux et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP Michele LaFountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Maria L. Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M O'gara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Hasting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP Carlos Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Steven Descoteaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Mici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. O'Gara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emory G. Snell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?