Epson America, Inc. v. Vankyo
Plaintiff: Epson America, Inc.
Defendant: Vankyo
Case Number: 1:2020cv12104
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 9 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Vankyo answer due. 2/1/2021. (Bono, Christine)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 2/1/2021 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Epson America, Inc..(Nickerson, Morgan)
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Vankyo answer due 1/18/2021. (Bono, Christine)
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/18/2021 to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Epson America, Inc..(Nickerson, Morgan)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Epson America, Inc.. Vankyo served on 11/25/2020, answer due 12/16/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Epson America, Inc.. (Nickerson, Morgan)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Report on Filing or Determination Re: Patent or Trademark AO 120. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Report on the filing/termination of patent/trademark case. (Vieira, Leonardo)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vankyo Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8524016 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Epson America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Nickerson, Morgan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epson America, Inc. v. Vankyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vankyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epson America, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan T. Nickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?