Germain-Posey et al v. U.S. Bank, National Association
Plaintiff: Amy S. Germain-Posey and Michael E. Posey
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv12181
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Bank, National Association.(Guillory Tadesse, Krystle)
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record U.S. Bank, National Association summons served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020.. (Guillory Tadesse, Krystle)
December 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by U.S. Bank, National Association of Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation)(Guillory Tadesse, Krystle)
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE issued to Attorney Devin L. Hoffman regarding mandatory use of ECF in compliance with Local Rule 5.4. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Burgos, Sandra)
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email.(Burgos, Sandra)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Ankrom on behalf of U.S. Bank, National Association (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Farside, Jr on behalf of U.S. Bank, National Association (Farside, Joseph)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank, National Association.. (Guillory Tadesse, Krystle)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Bank, National Association ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8545377 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Form)(Guillory Tadesse, Krystle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Germain-Posey et al v. U.S. Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy S. Germain-Posey
Represented By: Devin L. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Posey
Represented By: Devin L. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Krystle S. Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?