Jimenez Paulino et al v. Hatch Landscape and Design, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Juan Jimenez Paulino and Manuel Ceballos
Defendant: Jared Hatch, HATCH LANDSCAPE AND DESIGN, INC., a/k/a HATCH ASPHALT MANAGEMENT, THE HATCH GROUP, INC., Hatch Landscape and Design, Inc. and Hatch Asphalt Management
Case Number: 1:2020cv12194
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jared Hatch served on 1/26/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Borgas, Danilo)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Hatch Landscape and Design, Inc. served on 1/26/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Borgas, Danilo)
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed The Hatch Group, Inc. served on 1/26/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Borgas, Danilo)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jared Hatch, Hatch Landscape and Design, Inc., The Hatch Group, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8548628 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Manuel Ceballos, Juan Jimenez Paulino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Borgas, Danilo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez Paulino et al v. Hatch Landscape and Design, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HATCH LANDSCAPE AND DESIGN, INC., a/k/a HATCH ASPHALT MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HATCH GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hatch Landscape and Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hatch Asphalt Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Jimenez Paulino
Represented By: Danilo A. Borgas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Ceballos
Represented By: Danilo A. Borgas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?