Craft Beer Cellar Group, LLC v. Beaucher et al
Plaintiff: Craft Beer Cellar Group, LLC and Craft Beer Stellar, LLC
Defendant: Nerd Craft, LLC, Jessica Beeby and Brian Beaucher
Case Number: 1:2020cv12214
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by Craft Beer Cellar Group, LLC (Pinilla, Gabriel)
January 20, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed All Defendants. (Cotney, Trenton)
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Gabriel Pinilla. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 18, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gabriel Pinilla Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8595565 by Craft Beer Cellar Group, LLC.(Cotney, Trenton)
January 18, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Craft Beer Cellar Group, LLC. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by Craft Beer Cellar Group, LLC. (Cotney, Trenton)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Craft Beer Cellar Group, LLC. (Cotney, Trenton)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet Category Form by Craft Beer Cellar Group, LLC. (Cotney, Trenton)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Cotney, Trenton)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Report on Filing or Determination Re: Patent or Trademark AO 120. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Report on the filing/termination of patent/trademark case. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CRAFT BEER CELLAR GROUP, LLC F/K/A CRAFT BEER STELLAR, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8552072 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by CRAFT BEER CELLAR GROUP, LLC F/K/A CRAFT BEER STELLAR, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBC Franchise Agreement 2015 Beaucher Complete, #2 Exhibit B - Trademark Certificates, #3 Exhibit C - Termination Notice 12-18-2019, #4 Exhibit D - Trademark Notice 08-14-2020, #5 Exhibit E - Default Termination Notice 09-04-2020, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cotney, Trenton) Modified on 12/14/2020 to Correct Docket Text (Paine, Matthew). (Attachment 6 replaced on 12/15/2020) (Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craft Beer Cellar Group, LLC v. Beaucher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craft Beer Cellar Group, LLC
Represented By: Trenton H. Cotney
Represented By: Gabriel D. Pinilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craft Beer Stellar, LLC
Represented By: Trenton H. Cotney
Represented By: Gabriel D. Pinilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nerd Craft, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Beeby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Beaucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?