Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc. v. Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc.
Defendant: Victor Ide-Okoye, Ogor Winnie Okoye and Umuoji Improvement Union, Massachusetts, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv12229
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 16 Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Victor Ide-Okoye, Ogor Winnie Okoye, Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc., Umuoji Improvement Union, Massachusetts, Inc.. (Anosike, Godson)
February 11, 2021 Filing 15 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered: re: #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Motion ALLOWED; opposition to motion for a preliminary injunction, if any, shall be filled on or before Friday, February 19, 2021. (Vieira, Leonardo)
February 10, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/14/2021 to To File Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Victor Ide-Okoye, Ogor Winnie Okoye, Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc., Umuoji Improvement Union, Massachusetts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Electronic Filing)(Anosike, Godson)
February 9, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #10 Motion for Joinder by the Court and to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion. Counsel who filed these document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of them to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Lima, Christine) Modified on 2/9/2021 to fix docket text (Vieira, Leonardo).
February 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Godson A. Anosike on behalf of Victor Ide-Okoye, Ogor Winnie Okoye, Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc., Umuoji Improvement Union, Massachusetts, Inc. (Anosike, Godson)
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 Motion for Joinder by the Court and to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Victor Ide-Okoye, Ogor Winnie Okoye, Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc., Umuoji Improvement Union, Massachusetts, Inc.. (Anosike, Godson) Modified on 2/9/2021 to fix docket text (Vieira, Leonardo).
February 8, 2021 Filing 10 Motion for Joinder by the Court and to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Victor Ide-Okoye, Ogor Winnie Okoye, Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc., Umuoji Improvement Union, Massachusetts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to B, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Anosike, Godson) Modified on 2/9/2021 to fix docket text (Vieira, Leonardo).
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Victor Ide-Okoye answer due 2/8/2021; Ogor Winnie Okoye answer due 2/8/2021; Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc. answer due 2/8/2021; Umuoji Improvement Union, Massachusetts, Inc. answer due 2/8/2021. (Vieira, Leonardo)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: In the future all exhibits should be separated and filed as separate attachments. Counsel is reminded to review the local rules and the attorney handbook when filing documents with the Court by accessing our web page, at www.mad.uscourts.gov under CM/ECF E-Filing. (Vieira, Leonardo)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/08/2021 to File Answer by Victor Ide-Okoye, Ogor Winnie Okoye, Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc., Umuoji Improvement Union, Massachusetts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Okoye, Ogor) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/5/2021) (Vieira, Leonardo). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2021: #2 Exhibit A) (Vieira, Leonardo).
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Nici, Richard)
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (adminn, )
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT Peter Okeke by Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc.. (Pregent, Travis)
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc.. (Pregent, Travis)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc..(Pregent, Travis)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8556573 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover)(Pregent, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc. v. Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Ide-Okoye
Represented By: Godson A. Anosike
Represented By: Ogor Winnie Okoye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogor Winnie Okoye
Represented By: Godson A. Anosike
Represented By: Ogor Winnie Okoye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umuoji Improvement Union, Massachusetts, Inc.
Represented By: Godson A. Anosike
Represented By: Ogor Winnie Okoye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Umuoji Improvement Union (North America), Inc.
Represented By: Travis Pregent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?